Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1010020

EP1010020 - APPARATUS FOR REDUCING ROTATION OF AN ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  08.05.2009
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip08.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 10.06.2009  [2009/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE BROKEN HILL PROPRIETARY COMPANY LIMITED
600 Bourke Street
Melbourne, VIC 3000 / AU
[2000/25]
Inventor(s)01 / TURNER, Robert, John
402 Lemon Tree Passage Road
Salt Ash, NSW 2318 / AU
02 / MADDEVER, Richard, Arthur, Milne
1 Jenny Close
Elermore Vale, NSW 2287 / AU
03 / VAN DEN HEUVEL, Robert, Cornelius
38 Ridgewood Crescent
Eleebana, NSW 2282 / AU
[2000/25]
Representative(s)van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
NL-2502 LS The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2008/22]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Postbus 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2003/16]van Westenbrugge, Andries , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2000/25]Jorritsma, Ruurd , et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau Scheveningseweg 82 P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98939990.201.09.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998AU00709
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0893303.09.1997         Original published format: AU PO893397
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9912056
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1010020
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU11.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:G01V3/16, G01V3/165, G01V3/17, F16F7/10, F16F7/116
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesFR,   GB,   NL [2000/25]
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUR ROTATIONSVERMINDERUNG EINES GEGENSTANDES[2000/25]
English:APPARATUS FOR REDUCING ROTATION OF AN ARTICLE[2000/25]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE REDUIRE LA ROTATION D'UN ARTICLE[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2000National basic fee paid 
16.03.2000Search fee paid 
16.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
16.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
10.06.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
23.12.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/24]
27.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
31.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1144398  (PRAKLA GMBH) [X] 1 * column 2; figures 4,5; claims 1,2,5,8 *;
 [A]US3836841  (MORRISON H) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 2, line 10 - line 25 *;
 [A]US4639675  (HINTON GEORGE F [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * * column 3, line 4 - line 19 *;
 [A]FR2500934  (BARRINGER RESEARCH LTD [CA]) [A] 1 * page 2, paragraph 1; figures 1,3 *;
 [A]JPH01219683  (SHIMADZU CORP) [A] 1 * abstract *
International search[A]SU1527429  ;
 [A]US5117695  (HENDERSON FREDERICK H [US], et al);
 [A]FR2216481  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]);
 [A]US3597983  (SCHWARZSCHILD GUNTER J);
 [A]FR2266060  (HUOT DE LONGCHAMP JACQUES [FR]);
 [A]WO9638737  (VALTION TEKNILLINEN [FI], et al)
 [A]  - DERWENT ABSTRACT, Accession No. 90-281307/37, Class Q63; & SU,A,1 527 429 (GULKO) 7 December 1989.,