Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994757

EP0994757 - PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING OR PRE-SETTING A ROLL STAND [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.09.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.11.2006  [2006/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1
DE-80333 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Wittelsbacherplatz 2
80333 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BRÜSTLE, Roland
Grossenbuch 141
D-91077 Neunkirchen / DE
02 / RIETBROCK, Uwe
Wolfeneckerstrasse 21
D-91334 Hemhofen / DE
03 / SCHÄFFNER, Clemens
Röntgenstrasse 1/IV
D-82152 Martinsried / DE
 [2004/28]
Former [2000/17]01 / BRÜSTLE, Roland
Gro enbuch 141
D-91077 Neunkirchen / DE
02 / RIETBROCK, Uwe
Wolfeneckerstrasse 21
D-91334 Hemhofen / DE
03 / SCHÄFFNER, Clemens
Röntgenstrasse 1/IV
D-82152 Martinsried / DE
Application number, filing date98940053.624.06.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998DE01740
Priority number, dateDE199712897907.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19728979
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902282
Date:21.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994757
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994757
Date:23.11.2005
Language:DE
[2005/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B21B37/00
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FI,   NL [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG BZW. VOREINSTELLUNG EINES WALZGERÜSTES[2000/17]
English:PROCESS AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING OR PRE-SETTING A ROLL STAND[2000/17]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR LA COMMANDE ET LE PREREGLAGE D'UNE CAGE DE LAMINOIR[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase17.12.1999National basic fee paid 
17.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
17.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
20.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.12.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.01.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2002Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
27.05.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.09.2004Fee for grant paid
20.09.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination25.06.2002Appeal received No.  T0882/02
07.08.2002Statement of grounds filed
08.10.2003Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M04) [2003/41]
13.01.2004Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/03]
10.02.2004Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M01) [2004/07]
10.02.2004Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2004/07]
27.04.2004Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Request for further processing for:04.01.2002Request for further processing filed
04.01.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.02.2002Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
18.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
21.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
20.06.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[XA]DE19527521  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3-5,9 * column 2 - column 4; figure - * [A] 2,7;
 [XA]DE4416317  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,9 * the whole document * [A] 2,5;
 [XA]EP0560688  (LORRAINE LAMINAGE [FR]) [X] 1,3,4,9 * the whole document * [A] 2,5;
 [A]JPH07246411  ;
 [A]JPH05293516  ;
 [A]DE4301130  (HITACHI LTD [JP]);
 [PA]WO9815882  (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al)
 [XA]  - CHO S ET AL, "RELIABLE ROLL FORCE PREDICTION IN COLD MILL USING MULTIPLE NEURAL NETWORKS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NEURAL NETWORKS, (199707), vol. 8, no. 4, pages 874 - 882, XP000656476 [X] 1,3-5,9 * the whole document * [A] 2

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/72.595885
 [XA]  - LINDHOFF D ET AL, "ERFAHRUNGEN BEIM ENSATZ NEURONALER NETZE IN DER WALZWERKSAUTOMATISIERUNG", STAHL UND EISEN, (19940418), vol. 114, no. 4, pages 49 - 53, 208, XP000449399 [X] 1,3,4,9 * the whole document * [A] 2,5-7
 [XA]  - AUZINGER D ET AL, "NEUE ENTWICKLUNGEN BEI PROZESSMODELLEN FUER WERMBREITBANDSTRASSEN", STAHL UND EISEN, (19960715), vol. 116, no. 7, pages 59 - 65, 131, XP000629440 [X] 1,3,4,9 * page 59 - page 63; figures 1,8 * [A] 2,5
 [XA]  - PICAN N ET AL, "ARTIFICIAL NEURAL NETWORKS FOR THE PRESETTING OF A STEEL TEMPER MIL", IEEE EXPERT, (19960201), vol. 1, no. 1, pages 22 - 27, XP000585051 [X] 1,3,4,9 * the whole document * [A] 2,5

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/64.482953
 [XA]  - ORTMANN B, "MODERNISIERUNG DER AUTOMATISIERUNGSSYSTEME DER WARMBREITBANDSTRASSEBEI VOEST-ALPINE STAHL LINZ", STAHL UND EISEN, (19950216), vol. 115, no. 2, pages 35 - 40, 134, XP000496373 [X] 4 * page 37 - page 38 * [A] 1,3,5,7,9
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960131), vol. 096, no. 001, [A] * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940209), vol. 018, no. 079, Database accession no. (M - 1557), [A] * abstract *