Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0998683

EP0998683 - METHOD FOR RECORDING ULTRASOUND IMAGES OF MOVING OBJECTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.04.2002
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 21.01.2004  [2004/04]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TomTec Imaging Systems GmbH
Edisonstrasse 6
85716 Unterschleissheim / DE
[2000/19]
Inventor(s)01 / MUMM, Bernhard
Am Haldenberg 18
D-82291 Mammendorf / DE
02 / WALDINGER, Johannes
Mainstrasse 15
D-85579 Neubiberg / DE
03 / KAISER, Dietmar
Kreuzstrasse 2
D-85368 Moosburg / DE
[2000/19]
Representative(s)Müller, Frank Peter
Müller Schupfner & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Bavariaring 11
80336 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/19]Müller, Frank Peter, Dipl.-Ing.
Müller, Schupfner & Gauger Patentanwälte Postfach 10 11 61
80085 München / DE
Application number, filing date98940237.516.07.1998
[2000/19]
WO1998EP04430
Priority number, dateDE199713212525.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19732125
[2000/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9905542
Date:04.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/05]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0998683
Date:10.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999
[2000/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0998683
Date:23.05.2001
Language:DE
[2001/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01S7/52, A61B5/0456, G01S15/89
[2000/19]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/19]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR AUFNAHME VON ULTRASCHALLBILDERN BEWEGTER OBJEKTE[2000/19]
English:METHOD FOR RECORDING ULTRASOUND IMAGES OF MOVING OBJECTS[2000/19]
French:PROCEDE D'ENREGISTREMENT D'IMAGES ULTRASONORES D'OBJETS ANIMES[2000/19]
Entry into regional phase02.12.1999National basic fee paid 
02.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.11.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/19]
26.09.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
15.11.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.2001Fee for grant paid
08.02.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.02.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT16.07.2001
ES30.11.2001
[2004/04]
Former [2003/10]AT16.07.2001
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0736284  (POLZ HANS DR [DE]) [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11 * the whole document * [Y] 5,8;
 [X]US5315512  (ROTH JAMES A [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-11 * the whole document *;
 [PY]EP0802423  (SIEMENS MEDICAL SYSTEMS INC [US]) [PY] 5,8 * abstract *
 [X]  - MCCANN H A ET AL, "MULTIDIMENSIONAL ULTRASONIC IMAGING FOR CARDIOLOGY", PROCEEDINGS OF THE IEEE, (19880901), vol. 76, no. 9, pages 1063 - 1072, XP000112039 [X] 1,9,12,13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/5.9652