EP0937013 - TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE COATED WITH AT LEAST ONE THIN DEPOSIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.09.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.11.2003 [2003/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2001/25] |
Former [1999/34] | For all designated states SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE INTERNATIONAL 18, avenue d'Alsace 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIMAL, Jean-Michel 3, avenue Maurice Berteaux F-78300 Poissy / FR | 02 /
BARRIERES, Frédéric 12, rue Jean F-93400 Saint-Ouen / FR | [1999/34] | Representative(s) | Renous Chan, Véronique, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche 39, Quai Lucien Lefranc 93300 Aubervilliers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1999/34] | Renous Chan, Véronique, et al Saint-Gobain Recherche, 39, Quai Lucien Lefranc F-93300 Aubervilliers / FR | Application number, filing date | 98940291.2 | 21.07.1998 | [1999/34] | WO1998FR01598 | Priority number, date | FR19970009223 | 21.07.1997 Original published format: FR 9709223 | [1999/34] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9905072 | Date: | 04.02.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0937013 | Date: | 25.08.1999 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1999/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0937013 | Date: | 13.11.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C03C17/36, C03C17/22, C03C17/34 | [1999/34] | CPC: |
C03C17/3618 (EP,US);
C03C17/3435 (EP,US);
C03C17/36 (EP,US);
C03C17/3626 (EP,US);
C03C17/3639 (EP,US);
C03C17/3642 (EP,US);
C03C17/3644 (EP,US);
C03C17/3652 (EP,US);
C03C17/366 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IE, IT, LI, LU, PT, SE [1999/34] | Title | German: | DURCHSICHTIGES SUBSTRAT BESCHICHTET MIT MINDESTENS EINER DÜNNSCHICHT | [1999/34] | English: | TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE COATED WITH AT LEAST ONE THIN DEPOSIT | [1999/34] | French: | SUBSTRAT TRANSPARENT REVETU D'AU MOINS UNE COUCHE MINCE | [1999/34] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.1999 | National basic fee paid | 08.03.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.03.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1999 | Examination requested [1999/34] | 12.05.2000 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.11.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.06.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/45] | Request for further processing for: | 14.11.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 14.11.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.11.2001 | Decision despatched | 03.02.2001 | Request for further processing filed | 03.02.2001 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.02.2001 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4528244 (WINKELBAUER HOWARD M [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | JPH02233534 [ ] (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD); | [X]EP0536607 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]) [X] 1,2,8-13 * claims 18-25 *; | [A]EP0622645 (BOC GROUP INC [US]) [A] 1-15* claims 1-6 *; | [A]EP0712815 (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [A] 1-15 * claim - *; | [X]DE29702816U (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]) [X] 1,2 * claim 1 *; | [X] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19910506), vol. 114, no. 18, Database accession no. 169829k, page 346, XP000193771 [X] 1,2,8-10,14,15 * abstract * |