Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009886

EP1009886 - SUBMARINE PLOUGH [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2003
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SOIL MACHINE DYNAMICS LIMITED
Wincomblee Road
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE6 3QS / GB
[2000/25]
Inventor(s)01 / REECE, Alan Richard
Woodside, The Crescent, Wylam
Northumberland NE41 8HU / GB
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Vinsome, Rex Martin
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
12th Floor
Cale Cross House
156 Pilgrim Street
Newcastle-upon-Tyne NE1 6SU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/25]Vinsome, Rex Martin
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord St Nicholas Chambers Amen Corner
Newcastle-Upon-Tyne NE1 1PE / GB
Application number, filing date98940383.725.08.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998GB02555
Priority number, dateGB1997001883005.09.1997         Original published format: GB 9718830
GB1997002490326.11.1997         Original published format: GB 9724903
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9913171
Date:18.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009886
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1009886
Date:10.04.2002
Language:EN
[2002/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:E02F5/10
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/25]
TitleGerman:UNTERWASSERPFLUG[2000/25]
English:SUBMARINE PLOUGH[2000/25]
French:CHARRUE SOUS-MARINE[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase25.02.2000National basic fee paid 
25.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
21.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.06.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.10.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.12.2001Fee for grant paid
10.12.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR10.04.2002
IT10.04.2002
NL10.04.2002
DE11.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FR10.04.2002
NL10.04.2002
DE11.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
Former [2004/04]NL10.04.2002
DE11.07.2002
ES30.10.2002
FR03.01.2003
Former [2003/47]NL10.04.2002
DE11.07.2002
FR03.01.2003
Former [2003/31]NL10.04.2002
DE11.07.2002
Former [2003/09]NL10.04.2002
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP0296783  (LAND & MARINE ENG LTD [GB]) [Y] 1,2,5,6,10,13,18 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - line 39 * * column 3, line 13 - line 35 * * figures 1-3 *;
 [YA]US4011727  (SUZUKI KINYA, et al) [Y] 1,2,5,6,10,13,18 * figures 4,5 * * column 3, line 28 - line 57 * [A] 8;
 [A]US3824798  (SHIROYAMA K, et al) [A] 1,2 * figure 7 * * column 5, line 44 - line 65 *;
 [PX]EP0828031  (CABLE & WIRELESS PLC [GB]) [PX] 1,2,5,6,11,18 * abstract * * figures 1,9,14-16 * * column 1, line 7 * * column 5, line 49 - column 6, line 22 * * column 7, line 4 - line 54 *;
 [YA]DE3739041  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 1,2,4,5,18 * figure 1 * [A] 10;
 [Y]GB1493346  (EDE A) [Y] 1,2,4,5,18 * page 4, column L, line 42 - column R, line 119 * * figures 6,7,8,8A,9 *;
 [Y]US4410297  (LYNCH ROBERT P [US]) [Y] 1,2 * figures 1,7,8 * * column 8, line 54 - column 9, line 7 *;
 [Y]JPH01264511  ;
 [A]DE727746  (AEG) [A] 7 * figure . * * page 1, column L, line 34 - column R, line 50 *;
 [A]FR1156475  (ROLAND DE LA POYPE) [A] 13-15 * figure 1 *;
 [A]US4664553  (GRINSTED TIMOTHY W [GB], et al) [A] 1,12 * figures 1,4,6 * * column 3, line 8 - line 38 *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900119), vol. 014, no. 028, Database accession no. (E - 875), [Y] 1,2 * abstract * * figures 2,3 *