EP1020013 - LINEAR MOTOR COMPRESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2005 Database last updated on 19.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 27.08.2008 [2008/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Z & D Limited 1 Fursby Avenue London N3 1PJ / GB | [2000/45] |
Former [2000/29] | For all designated states Z & D Limited 36 Brooksby Street London N1 1HA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Wei-Min 36 Brooksby Street London N1 1HA / GB | [2000/29] | Representative(s) | Stuart, Ian Alexander Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Stuart, Ian Alexander Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2004/34] | Stuart, Ian Alexander Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 98940449.6 | 01.09.1998 | [2000/29] | WO1998GB02624 | Priority number, date | GB19970021090 | 04.10.1997 Original published format: GB 9721090 | GB19980009192 | 29.04.1998 Original published format: GB 9809192 | GB19980014171 | 30.06.1998 Original published format: GB 9814171 | [2000/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9918649 | Date: | 15.04.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1020013 | Date: | 19.07.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.04.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1020013 | Date: | 28.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.04.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H02K33/16, F04B35/04, H02P7/622 | [2000/29] | CPC: |
H02K33/16 (EP,US);
F04B35/045 (EP,US);
H02P25/04 (EP,US);
H02K16/00 (EP,US);
H02K7/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/29] | Title | German: | LINEARMOTORKOMPRESSOR | [2000/29] | English: | LINEAR MOTOR COMPRESSOR | [2000/29] | French: | COMPRESSEUR A MOTEUR LINEAIRE | [2000/29] | Entry into regional phase | 06.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.04.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/29] | 22.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 04.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/16] | Request for further processing for: | 27.03.2002 | Request for further processing filed | 27.03.2002 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 23.04.2002 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.09.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   13.11.2002 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.04.2004 | BE | 28.04.2004 | CH | 28.04.2004 | CY | 28.04.2004 | FI | 28.04.2004 | LI | 28.04.2004 | NL | 28.04.2004 | DK | 28.07.2004 | GR | 28.07.2004 | SE | 28.07.2004 | ES | 08.08.2004 | LU | 01.09.2004 | PT | 28.09.2004 | MC | 30.09.2004 | [2008/16] |
Former [2007/18] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
CY | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
NL | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
LU | 01.09.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
NL | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
MC | 30.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
DK | 28.07.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
BE | 28.04.2004 | ||
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 28.04.2004 | |
CH | 28.04.2004 | ||
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.07.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
FI | 28.04.2004 | ||
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
ES | 08.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.07.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 28.04.2004 | |
LI | 28.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [XY]GB2266932 (YIH KAI ENTERPRISE CO LTD [TW]) [X] 1-6,9 * abstract * * page 1, line 5 - page 1, line 32 * * figure 1 * [Y] 7,8,10-14; | [YD]GB2299715 (ZHANG WEI MIN [GB]) [YD] 7,8 * page 7, line 9 - page 8, line 16 *; | [Y]EP0283109 (YANG TAI HER) [Y] 10,11 * figures 1-1.10 *; | [Y]US4613285 (SATO EIJI [JP], et al) [Y] 12-14 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 26 *; | [X]US4704553 (RESNICOW HERBERT [US]) [X] 15,16 * abstract *; | [X]US5296767 (ASSELIN PIERRE [US]) [X] 17-19 * column 2, line 5 - column 2, line 26 *; | [XY]EP0343350 (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 20 * abstract * * figure 1 * [Y] 21; | [YP]US5779455 (STEIGER ANTON [CH]) [YP] 21 * abstract * |