Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021046

EP1021046 - DECODING METHOD AND RECORDING MEDIUM CARRYING RECORDED DECODING PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  17.01.2003
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2008Change - applicantpublished on 19.11.2008  [2008/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka
571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / ONO, Tadashi
3-6-9, Kasumizaka, Kyotanabe-shi
Kyoto 610-0352 / JP
02 / JURI, Tatsuro
1-5-8-2804, Tomobuchi-cho, Miyakojima-ku
Osaka-shi, Osaka 534-0016 / JP
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98940625.128.08.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998JP03863
Priority number, dateJP1997024066905.09.1997         Original published format: JP 24066997
JP1998011676227.04.1998         Original published format: JP 11676298
[2000/29]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9913647
Date:18.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1021046
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999
[2000/29]
Search report(s)International search reportJP18.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP03.11.2000
ClassificationInternational:H04N7/56, H04N5/928, H04N7/52
[2000/38]
Former International [2000/29]H04N7/56, H04N5/928
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/29]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DEKODIERUNG UND AUFZEICHNUNFSMEDIUM MIT DARAUF AUFGEZEICHNETEM DEKODIERUNGSPROGRAMM[2000/29]
English:DECODING METHOD AND RECORDING MEDIUM CARRYING RECORDED DECODING PROGRAM[2000/29]
French:PROCEDE DE DECODAGE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT OU EST ENREGISTRE UN PROGRAMME DE DECODAGE[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase02.03.2000Translation filed 
02.03.2000National basic fee paid 
02.03.2000Search fee paid 
02.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP
02.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
05.10.2001Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2003Application withdrawn by applicant  [2003/10]
Divisional application(s)EP01123864.9  / EP1193981
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0591944  (NEC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,2,6,18 * abstract * * column 9, line 38 - column 10, line 20; claim 5 * * column 7, line 5 - line 12 *;
 [X]JPH09149411  ;
 [A]JPH06121276  ;
 [A]JPH06233269  ;
 [A]US5559999  (MATURI GREG [US], et al) [A] 1,2,6,18 * abstract * * column 3, line 47 - column 4, line 8 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971031), vol. 1997, no. 10, [X] 1,2,6,18 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940729), vol. 018, no. 407, Database accession no. (E - 1586), [A] 1,2,6,18 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19941118), vol. 018, no. 608, Database accession no. (E - 1633), [A] 1,2,6,18 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH09149411  (XING INC, et al);
 [A]JPH08214296  (SANYO ELECTRIC CO);
 [A]JPH08289255  (SONY CORP)