Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002215

EP1002215 - AIR BAG CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.09.2002
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip06.09.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 23.10.2002  [2002/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
THE WHITAKER CORPORATION
4550 New Linden Hill Road, Suite 450
Wilmington, Delaware 19808 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SHIGA, Katsumi
2-3-B-907, Minamiohno
Ichikawa, Chiba 272-0804 / JP
02 / KITAMURA, Hiroshi
861-2-18-104, Shimoasao, Asao-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 215-0022 / JP
03 / SHINOHARA, Toshio
1-22-24-203, Inukura, Miyamae-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 216-0011 / JP
04 / YAMAGAMI, Hidehisa
1116-4-201, Kashimada, Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki, Kanagawa 211-0958 / JP
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Heinz-Schäfer, Marion
Tyco Electronics Logistics AG Ampèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Heinz-Schäfer, Marion
AMP International Enterprises Limited AMPèrestrasse 3
9323 Steinach (SG) / CH
Application number, filing date98940822.407.08.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998US16508
Priority number, dateJP1997022724608.08.1997         Original published format: JP 22724697
[2000/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9908062
Date:18.02.1999
Language:EN
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002215
Date:24.05.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002215
Date:31.10.2001
Language:EN
[2001/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:F42B3/10, H01R13/639
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/21]
TitleGerman:AIRBAG-STECKVERBINDER[2000/21]
English:AIR BAG CONNECTOR[2000/21]
French:RACCORD POUR AIRBAG[2000/21]
Entry into regional phase28.02.2000National basic fee paid 
28.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
18.01.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
19.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
19.04.2001Fee for grant paid
19.04.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)01.08.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE2960489U  (AUGAT COMPONENTS GMBH) [Y] 1,6,7,9,10;
 [Y]US5616045  (GAUKER BRADFORD K [US]) [Y] 1,6,7,9,10;
 [A]WO9807213  (THOMAS & BETTS INT [US]) [A] 1-10;
 [A]US5178547  (BONAS ANDREW B [US], et al) [A] 1-10;
 [A]EP0591948  (TRW INC [US]) [A] 1-10;
 [A]US5370555  (SMORAVEK MIROSLAV [DE]) [A] 1-10;
 [A]US5609498  (MUZSLAY STEVEN Z [US]) [A] 1-10;
 [A]EP0667655  (MOLEX INC [US]) [A] 1-10