Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1009317

EP1009317 - SYSTEM FOR IMPLANTING A CROSS-LINKED POLYSACCHARIDE FIBER AND METHODS OF FORMING AND INSERTING THE FIBER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip19.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 22.10.2008  [2008/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION
One Boston Scientific Place
Natick, MA 01760-1537 / US
[2000/25]
Inventor(s)01 / MCCRORY, Jennifer
655 South Fairoaks Avenue I-211
Sunnyvale, CA 94086 / US
02 / LÜSCHER, Patrik
Steinwiesstrasse 7
CH-8330 Pfäffikon / CH
03 / KAMATH, Kalpana
20 Silver Hill Lane
Natick, MA 01760 / US
04 / SAHATJIAN, Ronald
29 Saddle Club Road
Lexington, MA 01760 / US
[2000/25]
Representative(s)Davies, Gregory Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP
7th Floor
Churchill House
Churchill Way
Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/43]Davies, Gregory Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way
Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB
Former [2005/28]Davies, Gregory Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Three Trinity Court, 21-27 Newport Road
Cardiff CF24 0AA / GB
Former [2002/01]Davies, Gregory Mark , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road Wales
Swansea, Wales SA1 5ED / GB
Former [2000/25]Austin, Hedley William
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Alexandra House 1 Alexandra Road
Swansea Wales SA1 5ED / GB
Application number, filing date98940984.219.08.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998US17143
Priority number, dateUS1997091910728.08.1997         Original published format: US 919107
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911191
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1009317
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US11.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:A61B19/00, A61B17/12
[2001/04]
Former International [2000/25]A61B19/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL [2000/25]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM ZUR IMPLANTATION EINER VERNETZTEN POLYSACCHARIDFASER SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN FORMUNG UND EINFÜHRUNG[2000/25]
English:SYSTEM FOR IMPLANTING A CROSS-LINKED POLYSACCHARIDE FIBER AND METHODS OF FORMING AND INSERTING THE FIBER[2000/25]
French:SYSTEME D'IMPLANTATION D'UNE FIBRE DE POLYSACCHARIDE RETICULEE ET PROCEDES DE FORMATION ET D'INSERTION DE CETTE FIBRE[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase28.03.2000National basic fee paid 
28.03.2000Search fee paid 
28.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
28.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
28.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
28.07.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.12.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/24]
13.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
06.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
06.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200508   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO9604954  (ETH ZUERICH [CH], et al) [X] 12-14 * the whole document * [Y] 1-11,15,16;
 [YA]EP0424068  (JOHNSON & JOHNSON MEDICAL [US]) [Y] 1,4-11 * abstract * [A] 12,15;
 [YA]WO9508291  (BOSTON SCIENT CORP [US]) [Y] 2,3,15,16 * abstract * [A] 1,9,12
International search[A]US5443454  (TANABE SUSUMU [JP], et al);
 [A]US4159022  (PEVSNER PAUL H [US]);
 [A]US4994069  (RITCHART MARK [US], et al);
 [A]US5021059  (KENSEY KENNETH [US], et al)