Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018018

EP1018018 - A METHOD OF DIAGNOSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.06.2011
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
10.06.2011No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Southern Medical Diagnostics Pty Ltd
29 Molesworth Street
North Adelaide, SA 5006 / AU
[2009/30]
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
Lung Health Diagnostics Pty. Ltd.
Sturt Road
Bedford Park, South Australia 5042 / AU
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
THE FLINDERS UNIVERSITY OF SOUTH AUSTRALIA
Sturt Road
Bedford Park, South Australia 5042 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / DOYLE, Ian, Ross
11 Trumara Road
Marino, S.A. 5049 / AU
02 / BERSTEN, Andrew, David
33 Marine Parade
Seacliff, S.A. 5049 / AU
03 / NICHOLAS, Terence, Evan
31 Malcolm Street
Bedford Park, S.A. 5042 / AU
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Jones, Elizabeth Louise
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/12]Jones, Elizabeth Louise
Frank B. Dehn & Co., 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
Former [2004/05]Jones, Elizabeth, Dr.
Frank B Dehn & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
Former [2000/28]Marshall, Monica Anne , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98941151.704.09.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998AU00723
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0899905.09.1997         Original published format: AU PO899997
AU1998PP0506204.08.1998         Original published format: AU PP506298
[2000/28]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9913337
Date:18.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018018
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999
[2000/28]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018018
Date:04.08.2010
Language:EN
[2010/31]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU18.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2004
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/68
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/28]
TitleGerman:DIAGNOSEVERFAHREN[2000/28]
English:A METHOD OF DIAGNOSIS[2000/28]
French:PROCEDE DE DIAGNOSTIC[2000/28]
Entry into regional phase13.03.2000National basic fee paid 
13.03.2000Search fee paid 
13.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
13.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
25.04.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
24.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.07.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.04.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
20.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.11.2009Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 15.12.2009
15.12.2009Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
04.02.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.06.2010Fee for grant paid
09.06.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.05.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/28]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
20.01.2009Request for further processing filed
20.01.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
31.07.2007Request for further processing filed
31.07.2007Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.08.2007Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
15.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
11.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY04.08.2010
GR05.11.2010
PT06.12.2010
[2011/27]
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0602248  (YAMASA CORP [JP]) [X] 1,11,17,19-21 * page 3, line 25 - line 28 * * page 8, line 22 - line 24 * * page 8, line 25 - line 47 * * example 5 * * page 16, line 5 - line 7 * * page 16, line 14 - line 17 * * claims 4,6-10 *;
 [X]US5156950  (AKINO TOYOAKI [JP], et al) [X] 21 * claims 7-9 *;
 [X]EP0511011  (SURFACE ACTIVE LTD [GB]) [X] 1-4,21 * column 3, line 54 - column 4, line 9 *;
 [X]  - RUBIN P ET AL, "SURFACTANT RELEASE AS AN EARLY MEASURE OF RADIATION PNEUMONITIS", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF RADIATION ONCOLOGY, BIOLOGY, PHYSICS, (1983), vol. 9, no. 11, ISSN 0360-3016, pages 1669 - 1674, XP008036909 [X] 1,2,4,11,20 * abstract * * page 1672, column 2, paragraph 3 *
 [X]  - LEWIS JAMES F ET AL, "Altered alveolar surfactant is an early marker of acute lung injury in septic adult sheep", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (1994), vol. 150, no. 1, pages 123 - 130, XP008036907 [X] 1,2,4,10,12,13,17,19-21 * abstract * * page 124, column 2, paragraph 5 - page 125, column 1, paragraph 1 * * figure 5 * * page 129, column 1, paragraph 2 *
 [X]  - S. ABE, ET. AL., "Clinical Significance of Levels of Lung Surfactant Protein A in Serum in Various Lung Diseases.", JAPANESE JOURNAL OF THORACIC DISEASES, (1995), vol. 33, no. 11, pages 1219 - 1225, XP008036837 [X] 1-4,6,7,10,11,13,17,19-21 * abstract *
 [X]  - HONDA Y, "Clinical significance of serum surfactant proteins A and D in idiopathic interstitial pneumonia", DATABASE EMBASE, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1996), Database accession no. EMB-1997183224, XP002301034 [X] 1-4,6,10,11,13,15,17,19-21 * abstract *
    [] - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF THORACIC DISEASES 1996 JAPAN, (1996), vol. 34, no. SUPPL., ISSN 0301-1542, pages 181 - 185,
 [X]  - ROBERTSON BENGT ET AL, "Alveolar-to-vascular leakage of surfactant protein A in ventilated immature newborn rabbits", BIOLOGY OF THE NEONATE, (1995), vol. 68, no. 3, ISSN 0006-3126, pages 185 - 190, XP008036915 [X] 1-8,10-14,17,19-21 * abstract * * page 187, column 1, paragraph 2 - paragraph 3 * * table 2 * * page 189, column 2, paragraph 2 *
 [X]  - DOYLE IAN R ET AL, "Serum surfactant protein-A levels in patients with acute cardiogenic pulmonary edema and adult respiratory distress syndrome", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (1995), vol. 152, no. 1, ISSN 1073-449X, pages 307 - 317, XP008036808 [X] 1 * abstract *
 [A]  - LACHMANN B, "The role of lung surfactant in ARDS", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY DISEASES 1983 DENMARK, (1983), vol. 62, no. SUPPL. 126, pages 13 - 14, XP008036832 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LEWIS J F ET AL, "Surfactant and the adult respiratory distress syndrome", AMERICAN REVIEW OF RESPIRATORY DISEASE 1993 UNITED STATES, (1993), vol. 147, no. 1, ISSN 0003-0805, pages 218 - 233, XP008036839 [A] 1-21 * the whole document *
International search[XP]US5670328  (INOUE TAKESHI [JP], et al);
 [X]JPH049665  (TEIJIN LTD);
 [X]EP0511011  (SURFACE ACTIVE LTD [GB])
 [X]  - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF THORACIC DISEASES, 33(11), November 1995, ABE S. et al., pp. 1219-1225.,
 [X]  - JAPANESE JOURNAL OF THORACIC DISEASES, (December 1996), 34 Suppl., HONDA Y., pages 181-185.,
 [X]  - DERWENT, Accession No. 94-007558/01, Class S03; & WO,93 25701,A1 (YAMASA CORPORATION) 23 December 1993.,
 [X]  - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (December 1995), 152 (6 Pt 1), HONDA Y. et al., pages 1860-1866.,
 [X]  - RESPIRATION, (1995), 62(2), HONDA Y. et al., pages 64-69.,
 [XP]  - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF RESPIRATORY AND CRITICAL CARE MEDICINE, (October 1997), 156 (4 Pt 1), DOYLE I.R. et al., pages 1217-1229.,
 [XP]  - PEDIATRICS, (December 1997), 100(6), CLEARY G.M. et al., pages 998-1003.,
 [XP]  - EUROPEAN RESPIRATORY JOURNAL, (April 1998), 11(4), HERMANS C. et al., pages 801-803.,
Examination   - BEERS M F ET AL, "Localization, synthesis, and processing of surfactant protein SP-C in rat lung analyzed by epitope-specific antipeptide antibodies.", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY 12 AUG 1994, (19940812), vol. 269, no. 32, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 20318 - 20328, XP002088984
    - MURRAY J F ET AL, An expanded definition of the adult respiratory distress syndrome., THE AMERICAN REVIEW OF RESPIRATORY DISEASE SEP 1988, VOL. 138, NR. 3, PAGE(S) 720 - 723, (198809), ISSN 0003-0805,