Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019414

EP1019414 - PROCESS FOR PREPARING ORGANIC BORONIC ACID DERIVATIVES USING DIBORONIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.04.2006
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.10.2009Change - representativepublished on 04.11.2009  [2009/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]For all designated states
COMMONWEALTH SCIENTIFIC AND INDUSTRIAL RESEARCH ORGANISATION
Limestone Avenue
Campbell, ACT 2612 / AU
Inventor(s)01 / MARCUCCIO, Sebastian, Mario
5 Sporing Court
Endeavour Hills, VIC 3802 / AU
02 / RODOPOULOS, Mary
39 Baratta Street
Blackburn South, VIC 3130 / AU
03 / WEIGOLD, Helmut
54 Leeds Road
Mount Waverley, VIC 3149 / AU
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
Former [2003/23]Gillard, Richard Edward
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Former [2000/29]Kyle, Diana
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date98941154.108.09.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998AU00726
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0903808.09.1997         Original published format: AU PO903897
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9912940
Date:18.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019414
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019414
Date:08.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/23]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU18.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.04.2002
ClassificationInternational:C07F5/02
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG ORGANISCHER BORONSÄUREDERIVATE MIT HILFE VON DIBORONSÄURE[2000/29]
English:PROCESS FOR PREPARING ORGANIC BORONIC ACID DERIVATIVES USING DIBORONIC ACID[2000/29]
French:PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE DERIVES D'ACIDE BORE ORGANIQUE A L'AIDE D'ACIDE DIBORE[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase22.03.2000National basic fee paid 
22.03.2000Search fee paid 
22.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
27.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
14.03.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.04.2005Fee for grant paid
05.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
ES08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY08.09.2005
DK08.09.2005
GB08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
IE08.09.2005
IT08.09.2005
SE09.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
FR30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
[2008/45]
Former [2007/34]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
ES08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY08.09.2005
DK08.09.2005
GB08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
IE08.09.2005
IT08.09.2005
SE09.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2007/21]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
ES08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
CY08.09.2005
DK08.09.2005
GB08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
IE08.09.2005
SE09.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2007/18]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
ES08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GB08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
IE08.09.2005
SE09.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
LU30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/42]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
IE08.09.2005
SE09.09.2005
CH30.09.2005
LI30.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/40]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
IE08.09.2005
SE09.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/30]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE09.09.2005
MC30.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/27]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
SE09.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/26]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
DK08.09.2005
GR08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/22]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
NL08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/14]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
GR08.09.2005
PT14.11.2005
Former [2006/13]AT08.06.2005
BE08.06.2005
FI08.06.2005
Former [2005/52]FI08.06.2005
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0616010  (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 40 * page 27; examples 2-2 *;
 [X]US2931788  (HOFFMANN ARTHUR K, et al) [X] 40 * examples *;
 [X]WO9604241  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [X] 27,41 * preparations 5,31,46,50,65,66,78 *;
 [X]US856856  (FARMER SAMUEL [US]) [X] 27,40,41 * examples; column 2, line 58 *;
 [A]US3180707  (MCCLOSKEY ALLEN L, et al) [A] 1-45 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - QIANG CUI, DJAMALADDIN G. MUSAEV, KEIJI MOROKUMA, "Molecular Orbital Study of the Mechanism of Platinum(0)-Catalyzed Alkene and Alkyne Diboration Reactions", ORGANOMETALLICS, (1997), vol. 16, no. 17, pages 1355 - 1364, XP002192532 [Y] 1-45 * page 1356, column 1, line 1 - line 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/om960860h
 [Y]  - TATSUO ISHIYAMA, YOSHIYA ITOH, TAKAHIRO KITANO, NORIO MIYAURA, "Synthesis of Arylboronates via the Palladium(0)-Catalyzed Cross-Coupling Reaction of Tetra(alkoxo)diborons with Aryl Triflates", TERTRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1997), vol. 38, no. 19, pages 3447 - 3450, XP002192533 [Y] 1-45 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(97)00642-4
 [Y]  - ISHIYAMA T ET AL, "PLATINUM(O)-CATALYZED DIBORATION OF ALKYNES", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (1993), vol. 115, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 11018 - 11019, XP000857640 [Y] 1-45 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00076a081
 [Y]  - ISHIYAMA T ET AL, "A Synthesis of Allylboronates via the Palladium(0)-Catalyzed Cross-Coupling Reaction of Bis(pinacolato)diboron with Allylic Acetates", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19960916), vol. 37, no. 38, ISSN 0040-4039, pages 6889 - 6892, XP004030776 [Y] 1-45 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-4039(96)01505-5
International search[A]  - M.H. TODD ET AL., "Studies on the Synthesis, Characterisation and Reactivity of Aromatic Diboronic Acids", pages 6781-6784", TETRAHEDRON LETTERS, (1997), vol. 38, no. 38, pages 6781 - 6784, XP004091789

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(97)01552-9
 [X]  - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002954961
 [X]  - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002954962
 [X]  - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002954963
 [X]  - K. RAMALINGAM AND D.P. NOWOTNIK, "Syntheses of some isothiocyanatophenylboronic acids", ORGANIC PREPARATIONS AND PROCEDURES INTERNATIONAL, (1991), vol. 23, no. 6, pages 729 - 734, XP000863497
 [X]  - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002954964
 [X]  - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002954965
 [X]  - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002954966
 [X]  - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002954967
 [X]  - DATABASE REGISTRY, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, XP002954968