Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021686

EP1021686 - AN IMPROVED SOUND ATTENUATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.09.2005
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): PT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HRL Technology Pty. Ltd.
677 Springvale Road
Mulgrave, VIC 3170 / AU
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / JENVEY, Peter, Lee
7 Meribah Court
Parkdale, VIC 3195 / AU
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date98941168.111.09.1998
[2000/30]
WO1998AU00742
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0910611.09.1997         Original published format: AU PO910697
[2000/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9913274
Date:18.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/11]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1021686
Date:26.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1999
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021686
Date:24.11.2004
Language:EN
[2004/48]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU18.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.06.2001
ClassificationInternational:F24F13/24, F16L55/033, F01N1/24, B60K13/04
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/30]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER SCHALLABSORBTION[2000/30]
English:AN IMPROVED SOUND ATTENUATING DEVICE[2000/30]
French:DISPOSITIF AMELIORE POUR ATTENUER LE SON[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase10.04.2000National basic fee paid 
10.04.2000Search fee paid 
10.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
10.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
10.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
30.09.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.04.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.01.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.07.2004Fee for grant paid
29.07.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.08.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
19.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT24.11.2004
BE24.11.2004
CH24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
LI24.11.2004
NL24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
SE24.02.2005
PT24.04.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]AT24.11.2004
BE24.11.2004
CH24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
LI24.11.2004
NL24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
SE24.02.2005
Former [2006/14]AT24.11.2004
BE24.11.2004
CH24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
LI24.11.2004
NL24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
Former [2005/51]AT24.11.2004
BE24.11.2004
CH24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
LI24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
Former [2005/46]AT24.11.2004
CH24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
LI24.11.2004
DK24.02.2005
GR24.02.2005
Former [2005/36]AT24.11.2004
CH24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
LI24.11.2004
GR24.02.2005
Former [2005/26]CH24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
LI24.11.2004
GR24.02.2005
Former [2005/25]CH24.11.2004
FI24.11.2004
LI24.11.2004
Former [2005/24]FI24.11.2004
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2630056  (INDUSTRIAL ACOUSTICS CO) [Y] 1-14,16-21 * page 1, paragraph 2 * * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 3, paragraph 3; figures 1-3 * * page 6, paragraph 4 * * page 7, paragraphs 2-4 * * page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 2 *;
 [Y]EP0236810  (WACKER CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-14,16-21 * page 2, paragraph 1 *
International search[X]AU1643476  (INDUSTRIAL ACOUSTICS CO);
 [A]US4569471  (INGEMANSSON BENGT-ERIK [SE], et al);
 [A]GB2016085  (MEIER J IC);
 [A]FR2668539  (BRONZAVIA AERONAUTIQUE SA [FR]);
 [A]FR2543342  (CENTRE TECHN IND MECANIQUE [FR]);
 [A]EP0165145  (CHARBONNAGES DE FRANCE [FR])