EP0995135 - TRANSPONDER ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 02.03.2002 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2002 | Refusal of application | published on 17.04.2002 [2002/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AEG Identifikationssysteme GmbH Söflinger Strasse 100 89077 Ulm / DE | [2000/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAEGER, Holm Salzbornstrasse 1 D-65824 Schwalbach / DE | 02 /
BLOCH, Werner Körnerstrasse 14 D-73054 Eislingen / DE | [2000/17] | Representative(s) | Weber, Gerhard Patentanwalt Postfach 2029 89010 Ulm / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/17] | Weber, Gerhard Patentanwalt Postfach 2029 89010 Ulm / DE | Application number, filing date | 98941231.7 | 26.06.1998 | [2000/17] | WO1998DE01750 | Priority number, date | DE1997130166 | 14.07.1997 Original published format: DE 19730166 | [2000/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9904295 | Date: | 28.01.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0995135 | Date: | 26.04.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01V15/00 | [2000/17] | CPC: |
H01Q1/2225 (EP);
G06K19/07749 (EP);
H01Q7/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [2000/17] | Title | German: | TRANSPONDERANORDNUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2000/17] | English: | TRANSPONDER ARRANGEMENT AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2000/17] | French: | DISPOSITIF TRANSPONDEUR ET SON PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION | [2000/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/18] | 25.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 09.11.2001 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2002/16] | 19.11.2001 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2002/16] | 07.02.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.06.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2001 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE19536464 (SIEMENS AG) [X] 1-4,6-9,12,26,27 * column 2, line 42 - line 53; claim 10 *; | [X]US5211129 (TAYLOR VERN ET AL) [X] 1-4,6-9 * column 7, line 48 - line 66 *; | [X]US5025550 (ZIRBES GLEN L ET AL) [X] 1-4,7,12,26,27,30-33 * column 5, line 10 - line 17 *; | [XA]FR2733104 (DROZ FRANCOIS) [X] 1-4,6-9,30 * abstract * [A] 32,33 |