blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0993535


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.01.2003 No opposition filed within time limit published on  19.03.2003  [2003/12]
08.02.2002 (Expected) grant published on  27.03.2002  [2002/13]
06.11.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
14.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant
14.08.2001 Communication of intention to grant a patent
28.07.2001 First examination report
24.07.2001 Communication of intention to grant
27.06.2001 Renewal fee
02.06.2000 Renewal fee
03.03.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
03.03.2000 Request for examination filed published on  19.04.2000 [2000/16]
25.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
25.01.2000 Amendment by applicant
17.01.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
01.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
16.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
12.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication