blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

European Patent Register Assistant updated

In order to offer you the best possible learning experience we have launched an updated version of the European Patent Register Assistant online tutorial to include recent changes in the Register.

2019.08.29

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0993535
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0993535Global Dossier 27.03.2002B1
EP0993535 19.04.2000A2
Priority number Date
DE19728967 01.07.1997
DE9801861 30.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59803530D 02.05.2002D1
Priority number Date
DE19728967 01.07.1997
DE59803530 30.06.1998
DE9801861 30.06.1998
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6552659 22.04.2003B1
Priority number Date
DE19728967 01.07.1997
DE9801861 30.06.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9901635Global Dossier 25.03.1999A3
WO9901635 14.01.1999A2
Priority number Date
DE19728967 01.07.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19728967 05.07.2001C2
DE19728967 07.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19728967 01.07.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2175757T 16.11.2002T3
Priority number Date
DE19728967 01.07.1997