Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993535

EP0993535 - DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING MECHANICAL CONTROL MOVEMENTS AND/OR ELECTRIC SIGNALS BETWEEN A DOOR ACTUATING DEVICE AND A DOOR CLOSER DEVICE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.01.2003
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.01.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 19.03.2003  [2003/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG, Coburg
Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50
96450 Coburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
Brose Fahrzeugteile GmbH & Co. KG Coburg
Ketschendorfer Strasse 38-50
96450 Coburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / WALTZ, Uwe
Oberer Stephansberg 1
D-96049 Bamberg / DE
02 / PLEISS, Eberhard
Weidesweg 12
D-96253 Untersiemau / DE
03 / STENZEL, Manfred
Hauptwachstrasse 4
D-96047 Bamberg / DE
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Baumgärtel, Gunnar , et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Baumgärtel, Gunnar , et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Xantener Strasse 10
10707 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date98941277.030.06.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998DE01861
Priority number, dateDE199712896701.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19728967
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9901635
Date:14.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0993535
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.01.1999
[2000/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0993535
Date:27.03.2002
Language:DE
[2002/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:E05B65/20, E05B65/36, E05B17/04, E05B49/00, H01B7/00
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/16]
TitleGerman:ÜBERTRAGUNGSEINRICHTUNG FÜR MECHANISCHE STELLBEWEGUNGEN UND/ODER ELEKTRISCHE SIGNALE ZWISCHEN EINER TÜRBETÄTIGUNGS- UND EINER TÜRZUHALTEVORRICHTUNG EINER KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜR[2000/16]
English:DEVICE FOR TRANSMITTING MECHANICAL CONTROL MOVEMENTS AND/OR ELECTRIC SIGNALS BETWEEN A DOOR ACTUATING DEVICE AND A DOOR CLOSER DEVICE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR[2000/16]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE TRANSMETTRE DES MOUVEMENTS DE COMMANDE MECANIQUES ET/OU DES SIGNAUX ELECTRIQUES ENTRE UN DISPOSITIF D'ACTIONNEMENT ET UN DISPOSITIF D'ARRET DE PORTIERE D'AUTOMOBILE[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase28.12.1999National basic fee paid 
28.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
28.12.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
28.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
26.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
20.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2001Fee for grant paid
22.10.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.12.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[PX]US5791178  (CHAMBERLAIN L C DEREK [US], et al) [PX] 1-10;
 [A]US5367295  (GOKCEBAY ASIL T [US], et al) [A] 1-10;
 [A]FR2738586  (VALEO ELECTRONIQUE [FR]) [A] 1-10