blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0935589

EP0935589 - TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH AT LEAST ONE REFLECTING COATING AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.03.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip19.03.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.05.2004  [2004/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SAINT-GOBAIN GLASS FRANCE
18, avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[2001/20]
Former [1999/33]For all designated states
SAINT-GOBAIN VITRAGE
"Les Miroirs", 18 Avenue d'Alsace
92400 Courbevoie / FR
Inventor(s)01 / JORET, Laurent
31, rue du Chemin Vert
F-75011 Paris / FR
[1999/33]
Representative(s)Muller, René, et al
SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE
39, quai Lucien Lefranc
93303 Aubervilliers / FR
[N/P]
Former [1999/33]Muller, René, et al
SAINT-GOBAIN RECHERCHE 39, quai Lucien Lefranc
93303 Aubervilliers / FR
Application number, filing date98941478.429.07.1998
[1999/33]
WO1998FR01677
Priority number, dateFR1997000977131.07.1997         Original published format: FR 9709771
[1999/33]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9906335
Date:11.02.1999
Language:FR
[1999/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0935589
Date:18.08.1999
Language:FR
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0935589
Date:14.05.2003
Language:FR
[2003/20]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.1999
ClassificationIPC:C03C17/22, C03C17/34
[1999/33]
CPC:
C03C17/225 (EP); C03C17/3435 (EP); C03C17/3441 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [1999/33]
TitleGerman:DURCHSICHTIGES SUBSTRAT MIT MINDESTENS EINER REFLEKTIERENDEN SCHICHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG[1999/33]
English:TRANSPARENT SUBSTRATE PROVIDED WITH AT LEAST ONE REFLECTING COATING AND METHOD FOR OBTAINING SAME[1999/33]
French:SUBSTRAT TRANSPARENT MUNI D'AU MOINS UNE COUCHE REFLECHISSANTE ET SON PROCEDE D'OBTENTION[1999/33]
Entry into regional phase11.03.1999National basic fee paid 
11.03.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
11.03.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.03.1999Examination requested  [1999/33]
07.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2003Fee for grant paid
27.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.02.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/19]
Request for further processing for:01.09.2001Request for further processing filed
01.09.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
14.09.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
08.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[X]DD204693  ;
 [X]US3885855  (GROSS DANIEL M) [X] 1-5 * claims 1,2 *;
 [X]WO8402128  (GORDON ROY GERALD) [X] 1-5,7-12,17-20 * example -; claim 7 *;
 JPH03275533  [ ] (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD);
 [X]EP0546302  (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1-8 * claims 1-7 *;
 [DA]EP0638527  (SAINT GOBAIN VITRAGE [FR]) [DA] 9-17* the whole document *;
 [X]  - D.C. FRANCOIS ET AL., "reflectivity of scnx thin films: comparison with tinx,tinxcy and zrnx coatings and application to the photothermal conversion of solar energy", THIN SOLID FILMS., LAUSANNE CH, (198505), vol. 127, no. 3/4, pages 205 - 214, XP002064045 [X] 1 * page 206, paragraph 2 - page 207, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0040-6090(85)90191-9
 [X]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 84, no. 14, Database accession no. 84-082567, XP002064046 & DD204693 A 19831207 (BOLLINGER H) [X] 1-8 * abstract *
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19920420), vol. 116, no. 16, Database accession no. 157366k, page 347, XP000387010 [X] 1-8 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.