Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002280

EP1002280 - DEVICE FOR CONVERTING ONE CURRENCY INTO ANOTHER AND FOR RECORDING OR DEDUCTING THE PRICE OF THE DESIRED ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  28.06.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.08.2003  [2003/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Brieuc Du Roscoat, Rolland
10 bis, rue Arago
78500 Sartrouville / FR
[2000/21]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Breesé, Pierre , et al
Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]Breese, Pierre , et al
Breese - Majerowicz 3, avenue de l'Opéra
75001 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98941485.929.07.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998FR01684
Priority number, dateFR1997000986401.08.1997         Original published format: FR 9709864
[2000/21]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9906918
Date:11.02.1999
Language:FR
[1999/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002280
Date:24.05.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999
[2000/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP11.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F15/02
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:GERÄT ZUR UMRECHNUNG VON EINER WÄHRUNG IN EINE ANDERE WÄHRUNG UND ZUR AUFNAHME ODER ZUM ABZÄHLEN DER KOSTEN EINES GEWÜNSCHTEN ARTIKELS[2000/21]
English:DEVICE FOR CONVERTING ONE CURRENCY INTO ANOTHER AND FOR RECORDING OR DEDUCTING THE PRICE OF THE DESIRED ARTICLE[2000/21]
French:DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT LA CONVERSION D'UNE MONNAIE EN UNE AUTRE ET D'ENREGISTRER OU DE DEDUIRE LE PRIX DE L'ARTICLE VOULU[2000/21]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2000National basic fee paid 
02.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
02.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
04.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.02.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/33]
12.03.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2000
31.07.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]DE29613106U  (HAUGRUND JUERGEN DIPL ING FH [DE]) [A] 1-5 * page 1, line 19 - page 5, line 6 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]EP0104709  (DALEN JOHANNES VAN [NL], et al) [A] 1-5 * page 3, line 6 - line 30 * * figure 2 *;
 [A]US4677429  (GLOTZBACH RONALD W [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 4, line 11 - line 58 * * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE29702500U  (MEIER JOERG [DE]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 9 - page 5, line 9 * * figure 2 *