EP1001740 - USE OF THE Rb 1 GINSENOSIDE FOR STIMULATING ELASTIN SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/21] | USE OF THE Rb 1? GINSENOSIDE FOR STIMULATING ELASTIN SYNTHESIS | ||
[2003/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LVMH RECHERCHE 20 avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [2000/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MEYBECK, Alain Les Poissons,20 ter, rue de Bezons F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | 02 /
DUMAS, Marc 61, résidence le Windsor,47 ter, av. la Mouillère F-45100 Orléans / FR | 03 /
GONDRAN, Catherine 7, Allée des Mouettes F-45730 SAINT BENOIT SUR LOIRE / FR | 04 /
BONTE, Frédéric 54, rue Tudelle F-45100 Orléans / FR | [2001/02] |
Former [2000/21] | 01 /
MEYBECK, Alain Les Poissons,20 ter, rue de Bezons F-92400 Courbevoie / FR | ||
02 /
DUMAS, Marc 61, résidence le Windsor,47 ter, av. la Mouillère F-45100 Orléans / FR | |||
03 /
CHAUDAGNE, Catherine 4, rue des Mésanges F-45530 Vitry-aux-Loges / FR | |||
04 /
BONTE, Frédéric 54, rue Tudelle F-45100 Orléans / FR | Representative(s) | Giraud, Françoise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Giraud, Françoise, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 98941569.0 | 07.08.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998FR01770 | Priority number, date | FR19970010204 | 08.08.1997 Original published format: FR 9710204 | [2000/21] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9907338 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1001740 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1001740 | Date: | 15.10.2003 | Language: | FR | [2003/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/48 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
A61Q19/08 (EP,US);
A61K8/63 (EP,US);
A61K8/671 (EP,US);
A61K8/676 (EP,US);
A61K8/678 (EP,US);
A61K8/9789 (EP,US);
A61P17/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/21] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON GINSENOSIDE RB1 ZUR STIMULIERUNG DER ELASTINSYNTHESE | [2000/21] | English: | USE OF THE Rb 1 GINSENOSIDE FOR STIMULATING ELASTIN SYNTHESIS | [2003/22] | French: | UTILISATION DU GINSENOSIDE RB1 POUR STIMULER LA SYNTHESE DE L'ELASTINE | [2000/21] |
Former [2000/21] | USE OF THE Rb 1? GINSENOSIDE FOR STIMULATING ELASTIN SYNTHESIS | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2000 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.01.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.02.2000 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 19.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2695561 (LVMH RECH GIE [FR]) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [D]WO9406402 (LVMH RECH [FR], et al); | [A]WO9706659 (LVMH RECH [FR], et al) [A] 1-20 * example 9 *; | [A]EP0283713 (INDENA SPA [IT]) [A] 1-20 * page 3, line 44 - line 48; examples 2,5 *; | [A]JPS58113116 ; | [A]JPS63198609 ; | [A]JPS55129228 | [A] - MORELLE ET AL., "QUE PEUVENT NOUS APPORTER LES EXTRAITS VEGETAUX? 3eme PARTIE: LE GINSENG", PARFUMS COSMETIQUES AROMES, PARIS FR, (199103), vol. 97, pages 91 - 103, XP000201984 [A] 1-20 * page 93, colonne de droite, dernier paragraphe * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 213, Database accession no. (C - 187)<1358>, & JP58113116 A 00000000 (MUTSUKO KURITA) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 482, Database accession no. (C - 553)<3329>, & JP63198609 A 00000000 (EIKOUDOU KK) [A] 1-20 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 190, Database accession no. (C - 037), & JP55129228 A 00000000 (OSAKA CHEM LAB) [A] 1-20 * abstract * |