Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019323

EP1019323 - COMPOSITION BASED ON SAMARIUM SESQUISULPHIDE, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE AS COLOURING PIGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2005Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 08.06.2005  [2005/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
RHODIA CHIMIE
25, quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / BUSNOT, Sylvain
7, chemin de la Borne aux Loups
F-60157 Elincourt Sainte Marguerite / FR
02 / MACAUDIERE, Pierre
9, rue de l'Eglise
F-92600 Asnières-sur-Seine / FR
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Dubruc, Philippe , et al
Rhodia Services
Direction de la Propriété Industrielle
40 Rue de la Haie-Coq
93306 Aubervilliers Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Dubruc, Philippe , et al
RHODIA SERVICES Direction de la Propriété Industrielle 25, quai Paul Doumer
92408 Courbevoie Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98941573.207.08.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998FR01775
Priority number, dateFR1997001022908.08.1997         Original published format: FR 9710229
[2000/29]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9907639
Date:18.02.1999
Language:FR
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019323
Date:19.07.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019323
Date:04.12.2002
Language:FR
[2002/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:C01F17/00, C08K3/30, C09D7/12
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN AUF BASIS VON SAMARIUMSESQUISULFID, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG ALS FARBPIGMENT[2000/29]
English:COMPOSITION BASED ON SAMARIUM SESQUISULPHIDE, PREPARATION METHOD AND USE AS COLOURING PIGMENT[2000/29]
French:COMPOSITION A BASE D'UN SESQUISULFURE DE SAMARIUM, PROCEDE DE PREPARATION ET UTILISATION COMME PIGMENT COLORANT[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2000National basic fee paid 
06.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
06.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
29.08.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.12.2000Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.09.2002Fee for grant paid
27.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.09.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
10.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY07.08.2003
FI07.08.2003
IE07.08.2003
ES08.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
DK01.09.2003
[2005/23]
Former [2005/02]CY07.08.2003
FI07.08.2003
IE07.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
DK01.09.2003
Former [2004/52]CY07.08.2003
FI07.08.2003
IE07.08.2003
BE31.08.2003
Former [2004/40]CY07.08.2003
FI07.08.2003
IE07.08.2003
Former [2004/36]CY07.08.2003
FI07.08.2003
Former [2004/26]FI07.08.2003
Cited inInternational search[XY]EP0545746  (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [X] 1-9,22-24 * column 4, line 38 - line 39; claim - * [Y] 10-12,19,20,22-24;
 [XY]EP0680930  (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]) [X] 1-9,15-18,22-24 * column 4, line 26 - line 28; claim - * [Y] 10-12,19,20,22-24;
 [Y]WO9711031  (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR], et al) [Y] 10-12,19,20,22-24 * claims 10,11 *;
 [A]EP0203838  (RHONE POULENC SPEC CHIM [FR]);
 [A]FR2139620  (RAFFINAGE CIE FRANCAISE)
 [A]  - M.SATO, "Preparation and structure of sodium rare-earth sulfides, NaLnS2.", MATERIALS RESEARCH BULLETIN, (1984), vol. 19, no. 9, pages 1215 - 1220, XP002062475 [A] 1-24 * page 1216, paragraph 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0025-5408(84)90074-6