Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0974363

EP0974363 - REMEDIES FOR DRUG ADDICTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.05.2006
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.05.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.06.2006  [2006/24]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2005/25]For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
Former [2000/04]For all designated states
TORAY INDUSTRIES, INC.
2-1, Nihonbashi Muromachi 2-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 103-8666 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NAGASE, Hiroshi
2-10-4, Kajiwara
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 247-0063 / JP
02 / ENDOH, Takashi
1586-4, Hagizono
Chigasaki-shi, Kanagawa 253-0071 / JP
03 / SUZUKI, Tsutomu
5-4-23-40, Youkoudai, Isogo-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 235-0045 / JP
04 / KAWAMURA, Kuniaki
I-1, 1-20-33, Tsunishi
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248-0034 / JP
05 / OSHIMA, Koji
1-7-3-212, Nagahama, Kanazawa-ku
Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0011 / JP
06 / INADA, Hideaki
Kamakurayamaryou 403, 3-20-1, Kamakurayama
Kamakura-shi, Kanagawa 248-0031 / JP
[2000/04]
Representative(s)Coleiro, Raymond , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/04]Coleiro, Raymond , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98941687.002.09.1998
[2000/04]
WO1998JP03937
Priority number, dateJP1997023742602.09.1997         Original published format: JP 23742697
JP1997025204717.09.1997         Original published format: JP 25204797
[2005/05]
Former [2000/04]JP1997003742602.09.1997
JP1997025204717.09.1997
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911289
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0974363
Date:26.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0974363
Date:22.06.2005
Language:EN
[2005/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP11.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.03.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/485, C07D489/02, // C07D489:00
[2003/19]
Former International [2000/04]A61K45/00, A61K31/47, // C07D489:00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/04]
TitleGerman:HEILMITTEL FÜR DIE DROGENABHÄNGIGKEIT[2000/04]
English:REMEDIES FOR DRUG ADDICTION[2000/04]
French:REMEDES CONTRE LA TOXICOMANIE[2000/04]
Entry into regional phase28.05.1999Translation filed 
28.05.1999National basic fee paid 
28.05.1999Search fee paid 
28.05.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
28.05.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure28.05.1999Examination requested  [2000/04]
28.08.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
20.04.2005Request for decision received: Application is deemed to be withdrawn
22.04.2005Fee for grant paid
22.04.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.04.2005Result of request for decision (Application is deemed to be withdrawn): Request granted
Opposition(s)23.03.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[PY]WO9749422  (UNIV ROCKEFELLER ;KREEK MARY JEANNE (US)) [PY] 3,4,7,10,13 * page 2, line 29 - page 3, line 26 *;
 [DY]EP0577847  (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [DY] 3,4,7,10,13 * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 38 *;
 [PY]  - PAN Z Z, "mu-Opposing actions of the kappa-opioid receptor", TRENDS IN PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, ELSEVIER TRENDS JOURNAL, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (19980301), vol. 19, no. 3, ISSN 0165-6147, pages 94 - 98, XP004115911 [PY] 3,4,7,10,13 * paragraph "Concluding Remarks" * * paragraph "kappa and mu-receptors mediate opposite subjective effects" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-6147(98)01169-9
 [PY]  - JONES R M ET AL, "KAPPA-OPIOID RECEPTORS: RECENT ADVANCES AND IMPLICATIONS FOR DRUG DESIGN", CURRENT OPINION IN DRUG DISCOVERY AND DEVELOPMENT, CURRENT DRUGS, LONDON, GB, (1998), vol. 1, ISSN 1367-6733, pages 175 - 182, XP001013241 [PY] 3,4,7,10,13 * figure 2 *
 [Y]  - SHIPPENBERG T S ET AL, "SENSITIZATION TO THE BEHAVIORAL EFFECTS OF COCAINE: MODULATION BY DYNORPHIN AND KAPPA-OPIOID RECEPTOR AGONISTS", PHARMACOLOGY BIOCHEMISTRY AND BEHAVIOR, ELSEVIER, US, (1997), vol. 57, no. 3, ISSN 0091-3057, pages 449 - 455, XP002043591 [Y] 3,4,7,10,13 * paragraph "Conclusions" *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0091-3057(96)00450-9
 [A]  - MALIN D H ET AL, "NALOXONE PRECIPITATES NICOTINE ABSTINENCE SYNDROME IN THE RAT", PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (1993), vol. 112, no. 2/3, ISSN 0033-3158, pages 339 - 342, XP001106964 [A] 3,4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02244930
 [A]  - KARRAS A ET AL, "NALOXONE REDUCES CIGARETTE SMOKING", LIFE SCIENCES, PERGAMON PRESS, OXFORD, GB, (1980), vol. 27, no. 17, ISSN 0024-3205, pages 1541 - 1545, XP001106436 [A] 3,4 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0024-3205(80)90562-7
 [A]  - BARBER A ET AL, "NOVEL DEVELOPMENTS WITH SELECTIVE, NON-PEPTIDIC KAPPA-OPIOID RECEPTOR AGONISTS", EXPERT OPINION ON INVESTIGATIONAL DRUGS, ASHLEY PUBLICATIONS LTD., LONDON, GB, (1997), vol. 6, no. 10, ISSN 1354-3784, pages 1351 - 1367, XP002071399 [A] 3,4,7,10,13 * page 1352, right hand column, 3rd paragraph *;; figure 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1517/13543784.6.10.1351
 [T]  - TERENIUS L, "Rational treatment of addiction", CURRENT OPINION IN CHEMICAL BIOLOGY, CURRENT BIOLOGY LTD, LONDON, GB, (1998), vol. 2, no. 4, ISSN 1367-5931, pages 541 - 547, XP002956957 [T] 3,4,7,10,13 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1367-5931(98)80132-4
International search[Y]WO9315081
 [X]  - KUZUMIN ALEXANDER V. et al., "kappa-Opioid Receptor Agonist U50, 488H Modulates Cocaine and Morphine Self-Administration in Drug-Naive Rats and Mice", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY, March 1997, Vol. 321, No. 3, pp. 265-271.
 [X]  - SHIPPENBERG T.S. et al., "kappa-Opioid Receptor Agonist Prevent Sensitization to the Conditioned Rewarding Effects of Cocaine", THE JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGY AND EXPERIMENTAL THERAPEUTICS, 1996, Vol. 276, No. 2, pp. 545-554.
 [X]  - MAISONNEUVE I.M. et al., "U50, 488, a kappa Opioid Receptor Agonist, Attenuates Cocaine-Induced Increases in Extracellular Dopamine in the Nucleus Accumbens of Rats", NEUROSCIENCE LETTERS, 1994, Vol. 181, No. 1-2, pp. 57-60.
 [X]  - HEIDBREDER Ch.A. et al., "The kappa-Opioid Receptor Agonist U-69593 Attenuates Cocaine-induced Behavioral Sensitization in the Rat", BRAIN RESEARCH, 1993, Vol. 616, No. 1-2, pp. 335-8.
 [X]  - TSUTOMU SUZUKI et al., "Opioid Receptor Type and Dependency (in Japanese)", FOLIA PHARMACOLOGICA JAPONICA, April 1997, Vol. 109, No. 4, pages 165-173.
 [X]  - FUNADA M. et al., "Blockade of Morphine Reward Through the Activation of kappa-Opioid Receptors in Mice", NEUROPHARMACOLOGY, 1993, Vol. 32, No. 12, pp. 1315-1323.
 [X]  - TSUTOMU SUZUKI et al., "Mechanism of Development of Drug Dependency (in Japanese)", MOLECULAR MEDICINE, 1995, Vol. 32, No. 2, pp. 140-145.
 [Y]  - DI CHIARA CAETANO et al., "Drugs Abused by Humans Preferentially Increase Synaptic Dopamine Concentrations in the Mesolimbic System of Freely Moving Rats", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, 1988, Vol. 85, No. 12, pp. 5274-5278.