EP1007052 - COMBINATIONS OF ENDOMETRIAL SPARING PROGESTINS AND ENDOMETRIAL ATROPHIZING PROGESTINS WITH ESTROGENS, IN ORAL CONTRACEPTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.10.2005 [2005/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. U.S. Route No. 202 Raritan, NJ 08869-0606 / US | [2004/40] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states ORTHO PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION U.S Route 22 Nr.202 Raritan, NJ 08869-0602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAFRISSEN, Michael P.O. Box 165 Gladstone, NJ 07934 / US | 02 /
TAITEL, Haya 4 Lincroft Drive Gladstone, NJ 07934 / US | [2000/24] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 98942166.4 | 20.08.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998US17288 | Priority number, date | US19970057109P | 27.08.1997 Original published format: US 57109 P | [2000/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9909993 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1007052 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1007052 | Date: | 13.10.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.03.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/56, A61P15/18 | [2004/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/565 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/565, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/565, A61K31/565 (EP) |
Former IPC [2000/24] | A61K31/56 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/24] | Title | German: | KOMBINATIONEN VON ENDOMETRIUM SCHONENDEN GESTAGENEN UND ENDOMETRIUM ATROPHISIERENDEN GESTAGENEN MIT ESTROGENEN, BEI DER ORALEN EMPFÄNGNISVERHÜTUNG | [2000/24] | English: | COMBINATIONS OF ENDOMETRIAL SPARING PROGESTINS AND ENDOMETRIAL ATROPHIZING PROGESTINS WITH ESTROGENS, IN ORAL CONTRACEPTION | [2000/24] | French: | ASSOCIATIONS DE PROGESTATIFS CONSERVANT L'ENDOMETRE ET DE PROGESTATIFS ATROPHIANT L'ENDOMETRE AVEC DES OESTROGENES, DESTINEES A LA CONTRACEPTION ORALE | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 06.06.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.07.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 29.07.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.03.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US4390531 (EDGREN RICHARD A) [DA] 1-17 * abstract *; | [DA]US4616006 (PASQUALE SAMUEL A [US]) [DA] 1-17* abstract *; | [DA]US4921843 (PASQUALE SAMUEL A [US]) [DA] 1-17 * abstract *; | [DA]US5280023 (EHRLICH MARIKA [DE], et al) [DA] 1-17 * abstract * |