EP1009288 - APPARATUS FOR MAKING A FUSED LOOP OF FILAMENTOUS MATERIAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/25] | FUSED LOOP OF FILAMENTOUS MATERIAL AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING SAME | ||
[2015/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.12.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 10.01.2018 [2018/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axya Medical Inc. Suite 444C, 100 Cummings Center Beverly, MA 01915 / US | [2015/28] |
Former [2000/25] | For all designated states Axya Medical Inc. Suite 444C, 100 Cummings Center Beverly, MA 01915 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EGAN, Thomas, D. 12 South Street Marblehead, MA 01946 / US | 02 /
FENTON, Paul, V., Jr. 1 Flint Street Marblehead, MA 01945 / US | [2000/25] | Representative(s) | Grand, Guillaume, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [2015/28] |
Former [2010/09] | Grand, Guillaume, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2000/25] | Greenwood, John David, et al Graham Watt & Co. Riverhead Sevenoaks Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98942274.6 | 27.08.1998 | [2000/25] | WO1998US17770 | Priority number, date | US19970919297 | 28.08.1997 Original published format: US 919297 | US19980118395 | 17.07.1998 Original published format: US 118395 | [2000/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9909891 | Date: | 04.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1009288 | Date: | 21.06.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1009288 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/00 | [2000/25] | CPC: |
B29C65/08 (EP,US);
A61B17/0487 (EP,US);
A61B17/06166 (EP,US);
A61L17/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/5261 (EP,US);
B29C66/69 (EP,US);
B29C66/80 (EP,US);
B29C66/81422 (EP,US);
B29C66/81423 (EP,US);
B29C66/81433 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0454 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0619 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/73921 (EP,US);
B29C66/81463 (EP,US);
B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29K2067/043 (EP,US);
B29K2077/00 (EP,US);
B29K2101/12 (EP,US);
B29L2031/709 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7096 (EP,US);
B29L2031/7102 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2023/12 (EP,US);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2067/043 (US,EP);
B29C66/71, B29K2077/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2015/28] |
Former [2000/25] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERSCHWEISSTEN RINGES AUS FASERMATERIAL | [2015/12] | English: | APPARATUS FOR MAKING A FUSED LOOP OF FILAMENTOUS MATERIAL | [2015/12] | French: | PROCEDE D'ELABORATION D'UNE BOUCLE REUNIE PAR FUSION DE MATERIAU FILAMENTEUX | [2015/12] |
Former [2000/25] | VERSCHWEISSTER RING AUS FASERMATERIAL UND VORRICHTUNG ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | ||
Former [2000/25] | FUSED LOOP OF FILAMENTOUS MATERIAL AND APPARATUS FOR MAKING SAME | ||
Former [2000/25] | BOUCLE REUNIE PAR FUSION DE MATERIAU FILAMENTEUX ET SON PROCEDE D'ELABORATION | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2000 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2000 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 28.03.2000 | Examination requested [2000/25] | 16.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.05.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 29.05.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.05.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 23.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 21.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 29.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   15.02.2005 | 31.08.2009 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   04.09.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | IE | 27.08.2015 | LU | 27.08.2015 | BE | 31.08.2015 | CH | 31.08.2015 | LI | 31.08.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | [2018/02] |
Former [2017/40] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 27.08.2015 | ||
BE | 31.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
IE | 27.08.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.08.2015 | ||
LI | 31.08.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
GR | 09.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3386870 (MORIN LOUIS H) [A] 11,16,17 * the whole document *; | [X]US3513848 (WINSTON RONALD H, et al) [X] 11,13,16,17 * column 6, line 55 - column 14, line 22; figure - *; | [A]US3879981 (RICHARDS JOSEPH E) [A] 16,17* the whole document *; | [X]JPH03132334 (FUJI DENSAN KK) [X] 11,16,17 * abstract *; | [DX]US5417700 (EGAN THOMAS D [US]) [DX] 11,13,16,17 * column 5, line 44 - column 6, line 68; figure - * | International search | [X]US3762418 (WASSON W); | [Y]US4588408 (YAMADA SHIRO [JP]) |