Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1019935

EP1019935 - ROW ELECTRODE ANODIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.05.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Candescent Technologies Corporation
6580 Via del Oro
San Jose, CA 95119 / US
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / CHAKRAVORTY, Kishore, K.
6407 Berwickshire Way
San Jose, CA 95120 / US
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
Ladas & Parry LLP
Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/29]Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer , et al
c/o Ladas & Parry, Dachauerstrasse 37
80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date98942358.703.09.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998US18278
Priority number, dateUS1997094070630.09.1997         Original published format: US 940706
[2000/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9917324
Date:08.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1019935
Date:19.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1019935
Date:05.07.2006
Language:EN
[2006/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.04.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.2004
ClassificationInternational:H01J1/02, H01J9/02, H01J1/304, H01J3/02, H01J31/12
[2004/15]
Former International [2000/29]H01J1/02
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IE,   NL [2000/29]
TitleGerman:REIHENELEKTRODEN-ANODISIERUNG[2005/52]
English:ROW ELECTRODE ANODIZATION[2000/29]
French:ANODISATION D'ELECTRODE DE RANGEE[2000/29]
Former [2000/29]REIENELEKTRODEN-ANODISIERUNG
Entry into regional phase25.04.2000National basic fee paid 
25.04.2000Search fee paid 
25.04.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
25.04.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
25.04.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
11.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.01.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.05.2006Fee for grant paid
19.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.04.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/24]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
16.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
07.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Licence(s)ID:01 00/not-exclusive
For:[DE, FR, GB, IE, NL]
Licencee:U.S. FEDERAL GOVERNMENT
-
- / US
Date:24.03.2003
[2006/27]
Former [2003/35]ID:01 00/not-exclusive
For:all designated states
Licencee:U.S. FEERAL GOVERNMENT
-
- / US
Date:24.03.2003
[2006/27]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIE04.09.2006
[2008/16]
Documents cited:Search[XA]EP0364964  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]) [X] 2,4,8,9,12,13,16,20 * column 14, line 48 - column 16, line 11; figure 7 * * column 1, lines 8-13; figure 11 * [A] 1,3;
 [XAY]US5075591  (HOLMBERG SCOTT H [US]) [X] 2-4,7-9,12,13,16,19,20 * column 6, lines 19-44; figure 6 * * column 4, lines 53-66; figure 3 * * column 4, lines 20-52; figure 2 * [A] 1 [Y] 5,6,10,11,14,15,17,18;
 [YA]JPH0594760  ;
 [A]EP0681328  (XEROX CORP [US]) [A] 5,6,10,11,14,15,17,18 * column 4, lines 34-48; figure 2a *;
 [A]US5643817  (KIM KYUNG-SEOB [KR], et al) [A] * column 4, lines 5-27; figure 4 *
 [YA]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930813), vol. 0174, no. 40, Database accession no. (E - 1414), [Y] 5,6,10,11,14,15,17,18 * abstract * [A] 1-3
International search[A]US5397957  (ZIMMERMAN STEVEN M [US])