Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1012001

EP1012001 - A RAISABLE/LOWERABLE VEHICLE BED CARRYING LOADS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  25.08.2006
Database last updated on 15.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip25.08.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 27.09.2006  [2006/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Razorback Vehicles Corporation Pty. Ltd.
Suite 12, Edgecliff Mews, 201 New South Head Road
Edgecliff, NSW 2027 / AU
[2000/26]
Inventor(s)01 / KENDALL, Jeffrey
30 Gordon Street
Ararat, VIC 3377 / AU
[2000/26]
Representative(s)Marles, Alan David , et al
Stevens Hewlett & Perkins
1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Marles, Alan David , et al
Stevens, Hewlett & Perkins 1 St Augustine's Place
Bristol BS1 4UD / GB
Application number, filing date98942393.416.09.1998
[2000/26]
WO1998AU00766
Priority number, dateAU1997PO0924516.09.1997         Original published format: AU PO924597
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9914076
Date:25.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1012001
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999
[2000/26]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AU25.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.10.2000
ClassificationInternational:B60P1/02, B60P1/00
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/26]
Extension statesAL18.03.2000
LT18.03.2000
LV18.03.2000
MK18.03.2000
RO18.03.2000
SI18.03.2000
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUG MIT HEB-UND SENKBARER LADEPLATTFORM[2000/26]
English:A RAISABLE/LOWERABLE VEHICLE BED CARRYING LOADS[2000/26]
French:PLATEAUX DE VEHICULE POUVANT ETRE MONTES ET ABAISSES[2000/26]
Entry into regional phase18.03.2000National basic fee paid 
05.04.2000Search fee paid 
18.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU
18.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
12.08.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.11.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.04.2006Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/39]
12.05.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2006/39]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
14.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search   [ ] No further relevant documents disclosed
International search[X]US5630693  (SOBINA ROMAN [AU]);
 [Y]GB2299791  (U K LIFT COMPANY LIMITED THE [GB]);
 [Y]WO9500419  (DIAL BOX PTY LTD [AU], et al);
 [Y]WO9634778  (RAZORBACK VEHICLES MANAGEMENT [AU], et al);
 [Y]WO9807591  (RAZORBACK VEHICLES CORP PTY LT [AU], et al)