blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0991664 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0991664



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 153
16.07.2003 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
07.07.2003 Closing of application Search / examination 1
11.03.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) Search / examination 1
04.09.2002 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Search / examination 1
28.07.2000 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Search / examination 2
07.07.2000 Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights Search / examination 1
07.07.2000 Request concerning the applicant/representative Search / examination 1
01.03.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
28.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
28.02.2000 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
11.02.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
24.03.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
05.02.1999 Priority document Search / examination 56
12.01.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 5
12.01.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 70