blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0991664


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
25.07.2008 Change - representative published on  27.08.2008  [2008/35]
11.07.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn published on  27.08.2003  [2003/35]
04.03.2003 Application deemed to be withdrawn
30.08.2002 Surcharge for renewal fee
09.08.2001 Renewal fee
09.08.2000 Renewal fee
28.07.2000 Change - applicant published on  13.09.2000 [2000/37]
28.07.2000 Change - representative published on  13.09.2000 [2000/37]
25.02.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
25.02.2000 Request for examination filed published on  12.04.2000 [2000/15]
23.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
22.02.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
08.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
18.03.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
20.11.1998 PCT data prior to European publication
19.10.1998 PCT data prior to European publication