blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0991664
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0991664Global Dossier 12.04.2000A1
Priority number Date
EP9703701 11.07.1997
EP9804368 13.07.1998
EP98942551 13.07.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9902558Global Dossier 21.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
EP9703701 11.07.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9902557Global Dossier 21.01.1999A1
Priority number Date
EP9703701 11.07.1997