Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002143

EP1002143 - ALKALINE STRIP PASSIVATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  07.02.2003
Database last updated on 17.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip07.02.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 26.03.2003  [2003/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
Henkel Kommanditgesellschaft auf Aktien
Henkelstrasse 67
40589 Düsseldorf-Holthausen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / RIESOP, Jörg
Brüsseler Strasse 19
D-50171 Kerpen / DE
02 / KRAUTBAUER, Heike
Brüsseler Strasse 19
D-50171 Kerpen / DE
[2000/21]
Application number, filing date98942626.725.07.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998EP04670
Priority number, dateDE199713397206.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19733972
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9907917
Date:18.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002143
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1002143
Date:03.04.2002
Language:DE
[2002/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:C23C22/60, C23C22/66, C23C22/83
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:ALKALISCHE BANDPASSIVIERUNG[2000/21]
English:ALKALINE STRIP PASSIVATION[2000/21]
French:PASSIVATION ALCALINE DE BANDE[2000/21]
Entry into regional phase29.01.2000National basic fee paid 
29.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
29.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
05.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
30.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2001Fee for grant paid
28.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)06.01.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XY]GB1042108  (PYRENE CO LTD) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * page 1, line 22 - page 2, line 100 * * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 14 * * page 3, line 86 - line 100 * [Y] 6;
 [YA]EP0459549  (METALLGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE], et al) [Y] 6 * abstract * * page 3, line 39 - line 54 * [A] 1-5,7;
 [A]US3895970  (BLUM WILLIAM A, et al) [A] 6 * column A * * column 1, line 1 - column 2, line 24; claim 5 *;
 [A]WO9617109  (BRENT INT PLC [GB]) [A] 6 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - page 7, line 32 *