Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1070554

EP1070554 - AUTOMATIC WASHING TUNNEL FOR CLEANING AND DISINFECTING EXTERNALLY AND INTERNALLY WASTE CONTAINERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.05.2004
Database last updated on 12.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.06.2004  [2004/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ocana Pueyo, Pedro José
Calle Zaldoko, 15
31620 Gorraiz (Navarra) / ES
For all designated states
Platero Arlaban, Juan Angel
Calle Tadeo Amorena 41-3 B
31015 Pamplona / ES
[2003/28]
Former [2003/05]For all designated states
Ocana Pueyo, Pedro José
Calle Zaldoko, 15
31020 Gorraiz (Navarra) / ES
For all designated states
Platero Arlaban, Juan Angel
Calle Tadeo Amorena 41-30 B
31015 Pamplona / ES
Former [2001/04]For all designated states
Ocana Pueyo, Pedro José
Calle Cintruénigo, 18-bajo
31015 Pamplona / ES
For all designated states
Platero Arlaban, Juan Angel
Calle Tadeo Amorena 41-30 B
31015 Pamplona / ES
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/04]
Application number, filing date98942687.908.09.1998
[2001/04]
WO1998ES00246
Priority number, dateES1998000076908.04.1998         Original published format: ES 9800769
[2001/04]
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9952655
Date:21.10.1999
Language:EN
[1999/42]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1070554
Date:24.01.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.10.1999
[2001/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1070554
Date:09.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:ES21.10.1999
ClassificationInternational:B08B9/08, B08B9/36
[2001/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT,   PT [2001/04]
TitleGerman:AUTOMATISCHER WASCHTUNNEL ZUM REINIGEN UND DESINFIZIEREN DER INNEN- UND AUSSENSEITE VON ABFALLBEHÄLTERN[2001/04]
English:AUTOMATIC WASHING TUNNEL FOR CLEANING AND DISINFECTING EXTERNALLY AND INTERNALLY WASTE CONTAINERS[2001/04]
French:TUNNEL DE LAVAGE AUTOMATIQUE POUR LE NETTOYAGE ET LA DESINFECTION EXTERNE ET INTERNE DE RECIPIENTS CONTENANT DES RESIDUS[2001/04]
Entry into regional phase26.10.2000Translation filed 
24.10.2000National basic fee paid 
24.10.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.10.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.10.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.10.2000Examination requested  [2001/04]
28.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.01.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.2003Fee for grant paid
28.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]US3018200  (HUDDLE HARLEY E);
 [A]FR2708878  (MECA 3 SARL [FR]);
 [A]JPH09173996  ;
 [A]US3698029  (PULLIAM WILLIAM D);
 [A]US3444867  (THORNTON CHARLES R);
 [A]ES2072109T  (VERI, et al);
 [A]US3604038  (ILIO ROCCO F DI);
 [A]ES1032470U  (PEREZ RODRIGUEZ ARTURO [ES], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19971128), vol. 199711,