Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007220

EP1007220 - SPRAYING ATTACHMENT AND APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.08.2004
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 15.10.2008  [2008/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Prolitec S.A.
71, boulevard Sébastopol
75002 Paris / FR
[N/P]
Former [2003/22]For all designated states
Prolitec S.A.
1, rue René Lacoste
F-34470 Perols / FR
Former [2002/02]For all designated states
Société Prolitec S.A.R.L.
1, rue René Lacoste
34470 Perols / FR
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
Société Prolitec S.A.R.L.
Rue Gustave Gresse
26400 Aouste sur Sye / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BENALIKHOUDJA, Karim
Quartier Piarnoux
F-26400 Vaunavey la Rochette / FR
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Ravina, Bernard , et al
Ravina S.A.
8, rue des Briquetiers
Z.A. de Font Grasse
31700 Blagnac / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/42]Ravina, Bernard , et al
Ravina S.A. 8, rue des Briquetiers Z.A. de Font Grasse
31700 Blagnac / FR
Former [2000/24]Ravina, Bernard , et al
24, boulevard Riquet, BP 832
31080 Toulouse Cedex 06 / FR
Application number, filing date98942783.625.08.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998FR01850
Priority number, dateFR1997001059825.08.1997         Original published format: FR 9710598
[2000/24]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9910104
Date:04.03.1999
Language:FR
[1999/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1007220
Date:14.06.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1007220
Date:15.10.2003
Language:FR
[2003/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:B05B7/00, B05B7/04, A61M11/06, F23D11/10, B01F3/08, A61L9/14
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:VERNEBELUNGSKOPF- UND VORRICHTUNG[2000/24]
English:SPRAYING ATTACHMENT AND APPLIANCE[2000/24]
French:TETE ET APPAREIL DE NEBULISATION[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase23.03.2000National basic fee paid 
23.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
22.05.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.11.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
31.05.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.03.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.07.2003Fee for grant paid
01.07.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.07.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
14.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0608176  (BMA TECHNOLOGIES) [X] 1,2,8-12,16,17,19,20,26 * column 5, line 38 - line 57 *;
 [A]GB552689  (ANDREWS) [A] 2 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4657007  (CARLIN BENSON ET AL) [A] 5,6,13 * column W *;
 [A]US2869188  (CAMETO) [A] 25,26,29 * column 4, line 60 - line 69 *;
 [A]US3077307  (MOORE ET AL) [A] 31 * column W *