Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968532

EP0968532 - Lateral silicon carbide semiconductor device having a drift region with varying doping level [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/01]LATERAL SILICON CARBIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE HAVING A DRIFT REGION WITH A VARYING DOPING LEVEL
[2008/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.01.2010
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NXP B.V.
High Tech Campus 60
5656 AG Eindhoven / NL
[2007/31]
Former [2000/01]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / ALOK, Dev
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
02 / MUKHERJEE, Satyandranath
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
03 / ARNOLD, Emil
Prof. Holstlaan 6
NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
[2000/01]
Representative(s)Williamson, Paul Lewis , et al
NXP Semiconductors
Intellectual Property and Licensing
Red Central
60 High Street, Redhill
Surrey RH1 1NY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]Williamson, Paul Lewis , et al
NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd. Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House Station Road Redhill
Surrey RH1 1DL / GB
Former [2007/02]White, Andrew Gordon , et al
NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Cross Oak Lane
Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB
Former [2002/18]Duijvestijn, Adrianus Johannes , et al
Internationaal Octrooibureau B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Former [2000/01]Smeets, Eugenius Theodorus J. M.
INTERNATIONAAL OCTROOIBUREAU B.V., Prof. Holstlaan 6
5656 AA Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date98942955.024.09.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998IB01481
Priority number, dateUS1997095934628.10.1997         Original published format: US 959346
[2000/01]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922407
Date:06.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/18]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968532
Date:05.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968532
Date:04.03.2009
Language:EN
[2009/10]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE06.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/861, H01L29/78, H01L29/812, H01L29/808, H01L29/36, H01L29/24
[2008/23]
Former International [2000/01]H01L29/76, H01L29/36, H01L29/24, H01L29/78, H01L29/861
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/01]
TitleGerman:Laterale Siliziumkarbid-Halbleiteranordnung mit einem Driftgebiet mit veränderlichem Dotierungsniveau[2008/23]
English:Lateral silicon carbide semiconductor device having a drift region with varying doping level[2008/23]
French:Dispositif latéral à semi-conducteur en carbure de silicium ayant une région de drift à niveau de dopage variable[2008/23]
Former [2000/01]LATERALE SILIZIUMKARBID-HALBLEITERANORDNUNG MIT EINEM DRIFTGEBIET MIT VARIABELEM DOTIERUNGSNIVEAU
Former [2000/01]LATERAL SILICON CARBIDE SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE HAVING A DRIFT REGION WITH A VARYING DOPING LEVEL
Former [2000/01]DISPOSITIF A SEMI-CONDUCTEUR LATERAL AU CARBURE DE SILICIUM POURVU D'UNE REGION DE MIGRATION A NIVEAU VARIABLE DE DOPANT
Entry into regional phase28.07.1999National basic fee paid 
28.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
08.11.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.11.1999Examination requested  [2000/01]
31.07.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.01.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
04.02.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.08.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.12.2008Fee for grant paid
29.12.2008Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)07.12.2009No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
04.02.2008Request for further processing filed
04.02.2008Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.03.2008Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.09.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.09.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
02.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
30.09.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
30.09.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
Cited inInternational search[XP]DE19741928  ;
 [X]US5648671  ;
 [X]US5132753  ;
 [A]WO9615557  ;
 [A]EP0400934  ;
 [A]US4672738
ExaminationJPH08213606
 EP0652599
 EP0497427
    - ALOK D. ET AL, "High voltage (450V) 6H-SiC lateral MESFET structure", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEEE, STEVENAGE, UK, (19960926), vol. 32, no. 20, pages 1929 - 1931, XP000637916 * page 1930, right-hand column, lines 1-4 of second paragraph; figure 1 *
    - MERCHANT S., "Arbitrary lateral diffusion profiles", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES, IEEE, NEW YORK, NY, USA, (199512), vol. 42, no. 12, pages 2226 - 2230, XP000919436 * page 2226, left-hand column, last 4 lines of first paragraph *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/16.477783