Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1010310

EP1010310 - UNIVERSAL ADAPTER FRAMEWORK AND PROVIDING A GLOBAL USER INTERFACE AND GLOBAL MESSAGING BUS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.02.2013
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip08.02.2013No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 13.03.2013  [2013/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
JDA Software Group, Inc.
14400 N.
87th Street
Scottsdale, AZ 85260-3649 / US
[2011/37]
Former [2000/25]For all designated states
i2 TECHNOLOGIES, INC.
Suite 1600, 909 East Las Colinas Boulevard
Irving, TX 75039 / US
Inventor(s)01 / NOTANI, Ranjit, N.
1218 Hidden Ridge 2020
Irving, TX 75038 / US
02 / MAYER, John, E.
16323 Amberwood Road
Dallas, TX 75248 / US
03 / SHAH, Bhaven, S.
3220 Duval Road 3406
Austin, TX 78759 / US
04 / EVETTS, Gregory, A.
906 Thomasson Drive
Dallas, TX 75208 / US
05 / SAGAR, Ajit
1928 Park Place Boulevard 1106
Bedford, TX 76021 / US
06 / HILERIO, Israel
8636 Woodcreek Drive
Irving, TX 75063 / US
07 / CHISHOLM, David, A.
7012 Gerrards Cross
Plano, TX 75025 / US
 [2007/32]
Former [2000/46]01 / NOTANI, Ranjit, N.
1218 Hidden Ridge # 2020
Irving, TX 75038 / US
02 / MAYER, John, E.
16323 Amberwood Road
Dallas, TX 75248 / US
03 / SHAH, Bhaven, S.
3220 Duval Road # 3406
Austin, TX 78759 / US
04 / EVETTS, Gregory, A.
906 Thomasson Drive
Dallas, TX 75208 / US
05 / SAGAR, Ajit
1928 Park Place Boulevard 1106
Bedford, TX 76021 / US
06 / HILERIO, Israel
8636 Woodcreek Drive
Irving, TX 75063 / US
07 / CHISHOLM, David, A.
7012 Gerrards Cross
Plano, TX 75025 / US
Former [2000/25]01 / NOTANI, Ranjit, N.
858 Kinwest Parkway 188
Irving, TX 75063 / US
02 / MAYER, John, E.
16323 Amberwood Road
Dallas, TX 75248 / US
03 / SHAH, Bhaven, S.
8812 Saddlehorn Drive 228
Irving, TX 75063 / US
04 / EVETTS, Gregory, A.
906 Thomasson Drive
Dallas, TX 75208 / US
05 / SAGAR, Ajit
1928 Park Place Boulevard 1106
Bedford, TX 76021 / US
06 / HILERIO, Israel
8636 Woodcreek Drive
Irving, TX 75063 / US
07 / CHISHOLM, David, A.
5353 Keller Springs Road 2221
Dallas, TX 75248 / US
Representative(s)Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2012/14]Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
Former [2000/25]Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date98943280.221.08.1998
[2000/25]
WO1998US17300
Priority number, dateUS1997091822225.08.1997         Original published format: US 918222
[2000/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911043
Date:04.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1010310
Date:21.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999
[2000/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1010310
Date:04.04.2012
Language:EN
[2012/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04L29/06
[2000/25]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/25]
TitleGerman:UNIVERSELLE ADAPTEREINRICHTUNG ZUR AUSSTATTUNG MIT GLOBALER BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE UND GLOBALEM NACHRICHTENBUS[2000/25]
English:UNIVERSAL ADAPTER FRAMEWORK AND PROVIDING A GLOBAL USER INTERFACE AND GLOBAL MESSAGING BUS[2000/25]
French:STRUCTURE D'ADAPTATEUR UNIVERSEL ET PERMETTANT DE CONSTITUER UNE INTERFACE UTILISATEUR GLOBALE ET UN BUS DE MESSAGERIE GLOBAL[2000/25]
Entry into regional phase16.03.2000National basic fee paid 
16.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
16.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
02.03.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/25]
27.03.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2012Fee for grant paid
01.02.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP07015707.8  / EP1876793
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.03.2007
Opposition(s)07.01.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
25.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
24.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
18.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
09.08.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
21.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
23.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
20.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 14
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.09.200003   M06   Fee paid on   13.09.2000
31.08.200205   M06   Fee paid on   31.10.2002
31.08.201114   M06   Fee paid on   20.02.2012
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0456249  (HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * page 3, line 2 - line 13 * * page 3, line 43 - line 54 * * page 4, line 32 - line 51 * * page 5, line 8 - line 12 * * page 6, line 33 - line 39 * * page 9, line 31 - line 35 * * figure 1 * * figure 2 *;
 [PA]US5726979  (HENDERSON GREGORY SCOTT [US], et al) [PA] 1-24 * abstract * * figure 1A * * column 2, line 30 - line 50 * * column 5, line 37 - line 67 *
by applicantEP0456249
 US5726979