Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007124

EP1007124 - VAPORIZER FOR INHALATION AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTION OF ACTIVE INGREDIENTS FROM A CRUDE NATURAL PRODUCT OR OTHER MATRIX [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip08.01.2010Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 10.02.2010  [2010/06]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pate, David W.
Posbus 1397
1000 BJ Amsterdam / NL
[2000/24]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/24]
Representative(s)CAPRI
33, rue de Naples
75008 Paris / FR
[2004/25]
Former [2000/24]CAPRI SARL
94, avenue Mozart
75016 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date98943289.327.08.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998US17335
Priority number, dateUS1997091931728.08.1997         Original published format: US 919317
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9911311
Date:11.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/10]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1007124
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.1999
[2000/24]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1007124
Date:08.11.2006
Language:EN
[2006/45]
Type: B9 Corrected patent specification 
No.:EP1007124
Date:10.10.2007
[2007/41]
Search report(s)International search reportUS11.03.1999
(Supplementary) European search report -
dispatched on:
EP23.05.2001
ClassificationInternational:A61M15/00, A61M11/04
[2001/24]
Former International [2000/24]A61M15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:VERDAMPFER ZUM INHALIEREN UND METHODE ZUM EXTRAHIEREN VON AKTIVEN INHALTSSTOFFEN AUS EINEM NATURPRODUKT ODER EINER ANDEREN MATRIX[2000/24]
English:VAPORIZER FOR INHALATION AND METHOD FOR EXTRACTION OF ACTIVE INGREDIENTS FROM A CRUDE NATURAL PRODUCT OR OTHER MATRIX[2000/24]
French:BRUMISATEUR POUR INHALATION ET TECHNIQUE D'EXTRACTION D'INGREDIENTS ACTIFS D'UN PRODUIT NATUREL BRUT OU D'UNE AUTRE MATRICE[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase29.02.2000National basic fee paid 
29.02.2000Search fee paid 
29.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
27.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
11.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.08.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
15.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.09.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2006Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
19.05.2006Fee for grant paid
19.05.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.08.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Request for further processing for:19.05.2006Request for further processing filed
19.05.2006Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.06.2006Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.04.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
21.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
10.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
20.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
18.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
CY08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
[2010/06]
Former [2008/21]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
GR09.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2008/16]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
DK08.02.2007
SE08.02.2007
PT09.04.2007
Former [2007/31]AT08.11.2006
BE08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
SE08.02.2007
Former [2007/29]AT08.11.2006
FI08.11.2006
SE08.02.2007
Documents cited:Search[A]US3518052  (FOULDS JAMES TAYLOR) [A] 1,2,6,12,19,28,29 * column W *
International search[Y]US1071389  (BLOSSER JOSEPH W [US]);
 [Y]US5553607  (CHIU BERNARD [US], et al);
 [Y]US1858580  ;
 [Y]US437070  ;
 [YE]US5732685  (NAKAMURA MITSUYOSHI [JP])