Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1007580

EP1007580 - CONDENSATION COPOLYMERS HAVING SUPPRESSED CRYSTALLINITY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  24.06.2005
Database last updated on 22.09.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip24.06.2005Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 10.08.2005  [2005/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road Danbury
Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]For all designated states
UNION CARBIDE CHEMICALS & PLASTICS TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
39 Old Ridgebury Road
Danbury, Connecticut 06817-0001 / US
Inventor(s)01 / KUPPERBLATT, Sandra, Ann
8 Richards Drive
Flanders, NJ 07836 / US
02 / EATON, Robert, Francis
67 Mill Pond Raod
Belle Mead, NJ 08502 / US
03 / GOLDBERG, Daniel
25 Cargy Drive
Bordentown, NJ 08505 / US
04 / ARK, Wong, Fong
500 Stoneybrook Drive
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
05 / SIMPSON, David, Michael
12 Crown Road
Boonton, NJ 07005 / US
[2000/24]
Representative(s)Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/24]Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd , et al
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date98943380.025.08.1998
[2000/24]
WO1998US17593
Priority number, dateUS19970056801P25.08.1997         Original published format: US 56801 P
[2000/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9910403
Date:04.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1007580
Date:14.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.1999
[2000/24]
Search report(s)International search reportEP04.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08G63/08, C08G69/02
[2000/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/24]
TitleGerman:KONDENSATIONSCOPOLYMERE MIT UNTERDRÜCKTER KRISTALLINITÄT[2000/24]
English:CONDENSATION COPOLYMERS HAVING SUPPRESSED CRYSTALLINITY[2000/24]
French:COPOLYMERES DE CONDENSATION A CRISTALLINITE SUPPRIMEE[2000/24]
Entry into regional phase21.02.2000National basic fee paid 
21.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
21.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/24]
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.06.2005Application withdrawn by applicant  [2005/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
10.06.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.06.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
03.06.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
25.05.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200003   M06   Fee paid on   04.10.2000
Cited inInternational search[X]JPH09100344  ;
 [X]EP0274123  (BAYER AG [DE]) [X] 1-20 * page 3, line 54 - line 56; claims 1-3 *;
 [PX]EP0805175  (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-20 * page 5, line 39 - page 6, line 37; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9520621  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1-3,10,11,13-20 * claims 1-3 *;
 [A]WO9710280  (SOLVAY INTEROX LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-8,10-20 * claims 1-20 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970829), vol. 097, no. 008, [X] 1-20 * abstract *