Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1018930

EP1018930 - INSTRUMENT FOR MEASURING INTRAOCULAR PRESSURE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.07.2003
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip12.06.2009Change - representativepublished on 15.07.2009  [2009/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Heyraud, Marc
Recome 24 B
2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH
For all designated states
Grounauer, Pierre-Alain
Rue des Jordils 7
1036 Sullens / CH
For all designated states
Kureth, Jean-Bernard
Rue de l'Helvétie 52
2300 La Chaux-de-Fonds / CH
[2000/29]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/29]
Representative(s)Ganguillet, Cyril , et al
ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet Avenue du Théâtre 16 P.O. Box 5027
1002 Lausanne / CH
[2009/29]
Former [2000/29]Ganguillet, Cyril , et al
ABREMA Agence Brevets & Marques Ganguillet & Humphrey Avenue du Théâtre 16 Case postale 2065
1002 Lausanne / CH
Application number, filing date98943623.329.09.1998
[2000/29]
WO1998CH00417
Priority number, dateCH1997000239029.09.1997         Original published format: CH 239097
CH1998000048701.03.1998         Original published format: CH 48798
[2000/29]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9916343
Date:08.04.1999
Language:FR
[1999/14]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1018930
Date:19.07.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.04.1999
[2000/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1018930
Date:11.09.2002
Language:FR
[2002/37]
Search report(s)International search reportEP08.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61B3/16
[2000/29]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/29]
TitleGerman:AUGENDRUCKMESSGERÄT[2000/29]
English:INSTRUMENT FOR MEASURING INTRAOCULAR PRESSURE[2000/29]
French:INSTRUMENT DE MESURE DE LA PRESSION OCULAIRE[2000/29]
Entry into regional phase17.03.2000National basic fee paid 
17.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
17.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
17.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/29]
07.08.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.10.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.04.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.06.2002Fee for grant paid
21.06.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.06.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/36]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
ES28.03.2003
[2004/04]
Former [2003/22]NL11.09.2002
SE11.12.2002
Former [2003/14]SE11.12.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]DE2040238  (UNIVERSITY JOHN HOPKINS) [X] 1,2,10 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 10, paragraph L *;
 [XA]WO9115988  (COAN WILLIAM M [US]) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [A] 6
by applicantUS3992926
 US4987899