Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0991797

EP0991797 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE CONTINUITY IN SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  30.05.2003
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dr. Johannes Heidenhain GmbH
Dr. Johannes-Heidenhain-Strasse 5
83301 Traunreut / DE
For all designated states
Silicon Sensor GmbH
Ostendstrasse 1
12459 Berlin / DE
[2000/15]
Inventor(s)01 / KRIEGEL, Bernd
Ostendstrasse 1
D-12459 Berlin / DE
02 / KUDELLA, Frank
Schönblicker Strasse 8
D-12589 Berlin / DE
03 / ARNOLD, Rene
Weydemeyer Strasse 17
D-10178 Berlin / DE
[2000/15]
Representative(s)Ninnemann, Detlef , et al
Patentanwälte
Maikowski & Ninnemann
Postfach 15 09 20
10671 Berlin / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/15]Ninnemann, Detlef, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Maikowski & Ninnemann, Xantener Strasse 10
10707 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date98943631.622.06.1998
[2000/15]
WO1998DE01768
Priority number, dateDE199712769320.06.1997         Original published format: DE 19727693
[2000/15]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9859098
Date:30.12.1998
Language:DE
[1998/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0991797
Date:12.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.12.1998
[2000/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0991797
Date:24.07.2002
Language:DE
[2002/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:C30B13/02, H01L21/24, H01L31/0224, H01L21/768, H01L23/48
[2000/15]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/15]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG ELEKTRISCH LEITFÄHIGER DURCHGÄNGE IN HALBLEITER-BAUELEMENTEN[2000/15]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING ELECTRICALLY CONDUCTIVE CONTINUITY IN SEMICONDUCTOR COMPONENTS[2000/15]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'OBTENTION DE PASSAGES ELECTRO-CONDUCTEURS DANS DES COMPOSANTS SEMI-CONDUCTEURS[2000/15]
Entry into regional phase05.01.2000National basic fee paid 
05.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/15]
19.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.02.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.04.2002Fee for grant paid
12.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.04.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
29.04.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR24.07.2002
GB24.07.2002
IT24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FR24.07.2002
GB24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
Former [2004/04]GB24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
ES30.01.2003
Former [2003/17]GB24.07.2002
NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
Former [2003/09]NL24.07.2002
SE24.10.2002
Former [2003/03]SE24.10.2002
Cited inInternational search[X]WO8303710  (HUGHES AIRCRAFT CO [US]) [X] 1-4,9,17,18,20-23,31 * the whole document *;
 [X]US4221956  (FIELDING JOHN O, et al) [X] 1-6,8,17-22,25,30 * column 3, line 61 - column 6, line 65; claim 1 *;
 [X]US4224504  (ERIKSON CARL A, et al) [X] 1-6,8,17-22,25,30 * claims 1,4,5 *;
 [A]EP0101762  (BBC BROWN BOVERI & CIE [CH]);
 [A]US4141757  (CLINE HARVEY E, et al);
 [AD]US4159215  (ANTHONY THOMAS R [US], et al);
 [A]US4157564  (ANTHONY THOMAS R [US], et al);
 [A]US4101759  (ANTHONY THOMAS R, et al);
 [A]US4097226  (ERIKSON CARL A, et al)