Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0996527

EP0996527 - SLITTER WITH ITS OWN SUSPENSION FOR LONGITUDINAL CUTTING MACHINES WITH SCISSORS CUTTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 03.04.2002  [2002/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DIENES WERKE FÜR MASCHINENTEILE GMBH & CO KG
Kölner Strasse 7
51491 Overath / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]For all designated states
DIENES WERKE FÜR MASCHINENTEILE GMBH & CO KG
Kölner Strasse 7
D-5063 Overath 1 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / SUPE-DIENES, Rudolf
Rotter Weg 5
D-51491 Overath / DE
[2000/18]
Representative(s)Müller, Karl-Ernst , et al
Patentanwälte
Becker & Müller
Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/18]Müller, Karl-Ernst, Dr., Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Becker & Müller, Turmstrasse 22
40878 Ratingen / DE
Application number, filing date98943672.007.07.1998
[2000/18]
WO1998DE01945
Priority number, dateDE199713081518.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19730815
[2000/18]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9903654
Date:28.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/04]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0996527
Date:03.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.01.1999
[2000/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0996527
Date:11.04.2001
Language:DE
[2001/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B26D1/00
[2000/18]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   IT [2000/18]
TitleGerman:SELBSTFEDERNDES KREISMESSER FÜR SCHERENSCHNITT-LÄNGSSCHNEIDEMASCHINEN[2000/18]
English:SLITTER WITH ITS OWN SUSPENSION FOR LONGITUDINAL CUTTING MACHINES WITH SCISSORS CUTTING[2000/18]
French:COUTEAU CIRCULAIRE A SUSPENSION PROPRE POUR MACHINES DE COUPE LONGITUDINALE A COUPE AUX CISEAUX[2000/18]
Entry into regional phase19.01.2000National basic fee paid 
19.01.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/18]
06.07.2000Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.09.2000Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.12.2000Fee for grant paid
06.12.2000Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200003   M06   Fee paid on   16.09.2000
Cited inInternational search[DA]DE1842608U  (WILHELM BILSTEIN DREHEREI [DE]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PA]DE19610661  (WABAEMA GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1 * the whole document *;
 [PA]DE19612055  (WABAEMA GMBH [DE]) [PA] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [A]DE4038434  (GOEBEL GMBH MASCHF [DE]) [A] 21,22 * the whole document *