EP1000310 - IGNITION UNIT FOR A PASSENGER PROTECTION DEVICE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2004 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.09.2004 [2004/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NICO-PYROTECHNIK Hanns-Jürgen Diederichs GmbH & Co. KG Bei der Feuerwerkerei 4 D-22946 Trittau / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | For all designated states NICO-PYROTECHNIK Hanns-Jürgen Diederichs GmbH & Co. KG Bei der Feuerwerkerei 4 D-22946 Trittau / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LÜBBERS, Willi Hubertushof, Lauenburger Strasse 4 D-22958 Kuddewörde / DE | [2000/20] | Representative(s) | Czybulka, Uwe, et al Patentanwälte Haft, von Puttkamer Berngruber, Czybulka Franziskanerstrasse 38 81669 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/20] | Czybulka, Uwe, Dipl.-Phys., et al Patentanwälte Haft, von Puttkamer Berngruber, Czybulka Franziskanerstrasse 38 81669 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98943693.6 | 14.07.1998 | [2000/20] | WO1998DE01968 | Priority number, date | DE1997133353 | 01.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19733353 | [2000/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9906786 | Date: | 11.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/06] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1000310 | Date: | 17.05.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1000310 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | F42B3/12, F42B3/18 | [2000/20] | CPC: |
F42B3/124 (EP,US);
B60R21/16 (KR);
F42B3/103 (EP,US);
F42B3/127 (EP,US);
F42B3/18 (EP,US);
B60R2021/26029 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/20] | Title | German: | ZÜNDEINRICHTUNG FÜR EINE INSASSENSCHUTZVORRICHTUNG EINES KRAFTFAHRZEUGES | [2000/20] | English: | IGNITION UNIT FOR A PASSENGER PROTECTION DEVICE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE | [2000/20] | French: | UNITE D'AMOR AGE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE PROTECTION DES OCCUPANTS D'UN VEHICULE A MOTEUR | [2000/20] | Entry into regional phase | 13.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/20] | 22.02.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 20.09.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP01121108.3 / EP1164349 | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2000 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.01.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 27.03.2002 | GR | 27.03.2002 | IE | 27.03.2002 | NL | 27.03.2002 | DK | 27.06.2002 | LU | 14.07.2002 | BE | 31.07.2002 | CH | 31.07.2002 | CY | 31.07.2002 | LI | 31.07.2002 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/10] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
CY | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/51] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
BE | 31.07.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/39] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 31.07.2002 | ||
LI | 31.07.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/17] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
IE | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 27.03.2002 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2087044 (EXPLOSIFS PRODUIT CHIMIQ) [Y] 8 * figure . * * page 1, line 1 - line 8 * * page 3, line 5 - line 15 ** page 5, line 29 - line 34 *; | [XY]EP0029671 (ICI AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 6,10,11 * abstract * * page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 5, paragraph 4 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 7, paragraph 5 - page 8, paragraph 1 * * page 10, paragraph 2 * [Y] 1-4; | [XDY]DE4429175 (EMS PATVAG AG [CH]) [XD] 6,7,9,11,12 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - column 4, line 2 * * column 4, line 33 - line 56 * [Y] 8; | [XY]EP0658739 (ICI AMERICA INC [US]) [X] 6 * abstract * * column 4, line 21 - line 22 * * column 5, line 47 - column 5, line 26 * [Y] 5; | [Y]US5648634 (AVORY MARK LUCAS [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * abstract * * column 3, line 53 - column 4, line 2 * * column 5, line 45 - line 63 * * column 7, line 24 - line 67 * * column 9, line 37 - line 49 * * column 10, line 15 - line 20 * * column 10, line 32 - line 38 * * column 13, line 40 - line 57 * | by applicant | DE4102275 | DE4429175 |