Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0994777

EP0994777 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A METALLIC OR CERAMIC BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/17]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A METALLIC OR CERAMIC BODY
[2002/32]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Graf, Daniel
Eberdinger Weg 3/2
71254 Heimerdingen / DE
[2000/17]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/17]
Representative(s)Goy, Wolfgang
PATENTANWALT
Zähringer Strasse 373
79108 Freiburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]Goy, Wolfgang, Dipl.-Phys.
Zähringer Strasse 373
79108 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date98943702.510.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998DE01977
Priority number, dateDE199712977011.07.1997         Original published format: DE 19729770
[2000/17]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9902342
Date:21.01.1999
Language:DE
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994777
Date:26.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999
[2000/17]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0994777
Date:15.01.2003
Language:DE
[2003/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationInternational:B32B31/00, B32B18/00, B32B15/01
[2000/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES METALLISCHEN ODER KERAMISCHEN KÖRPERS[2002/32]
English:METHOD FOR PRODUCING A METALLIC OR CERAMIC BODY[2002/32]
French:PROCEDE POUR PRODUIRE UN CORPS METALLIQUE OU CERAMIQUE[2002/32]
Former [2000/17]VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN EINES METALLISCHEN ODER KERAMISCHEN KÖRPERS
Former [2000/17]METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A METALLIC OR CERAMIC BODY
Former [2000/17]PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR PRODUIRE UN CORPS METALLIQUE OU CERAMIQUE
Entry into regional phase23.12.1999National basic fee paid 
23.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.01.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/17]
05.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.10.2002Fee for grant paid
15.10.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
15.06.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
11.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFI15.01.2003
FR15.01.2003
GB15.01.2003
IE15.01.2003
IT15.01.2003
NL15.01.2003
DK15.04.2003
PT15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
AT10.07.2003
LU10.07.2003
ES30.07.2003
BE31.07.2003
CH31.07.2003
LI31.07.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2005/49]FI15.01.2003
FR15.01.2003
GB15.01.2003
IE15.01.2003
NL15.01.2003
DK15.04.2003
PT15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
AT10.07.2003
LU10.07.2003
ES30.07.2003
BE31.07.2003
CH31.07.2003
LI31.07.2003
Former [2005/11]FI15.01.2003
GB15.01.2003
IE15.01.2003
NL15.01.2003
DK15.04.2003
PT15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
AT10.07.2003
LU10.07.2003
ES30.07.2003
BE31.07.2003
CH31.07.2003
LI31.07.2003
Former [2004/52]FI15.01.2003
GB15.01.2003
IE15.01.2003
NL15.01.2003
DK15.04.2003
PT15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
LU10.07.2003
ES30.07.2003
BE31.07.2003
CH31.07.2003
LI31.07.2003
Former [2004/39]FI15.01.2003
GB15.01.2003
IE15.01.2003
NL15.01.2003
DK15.04.2003
PT15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
LU10.07.2003
ES30.07.2003
CH31.07.2003
LI31.07.2003
Former [2004/33]FI15.01.2003
GB15.01.2003
IE15.01.2003
NL15.01.2003
DK15.04.2003
PT15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
CH31.07.2003
LI31.07.2003
Former [2004/22]FI15.01.2003
GB15.01.2003
IE15.01.2003
NL15.01.2003
DK15.04.2003
PT15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/04]FI15.01.2003
IE15.01.2003
NL15.01.2003
DK15.04.2003
PT15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
ES30.07.2003
Former [2004/02]FI15.01.2003
IE15.01.2003
NL15.01.2003
DK15.04.2003
PT15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
Former [2003/43]FI15.01.2003
NL15.01.2003
PT15.04.2003
SE15.04.2003
Former [2003/41]FI15.01.2003
NL15.01.2003
SE15.04.2003
Former [2003/30]SE15.04.2003
Cited inInternational search[XP]WO9740983  (BURNS MARSHALL [US], et al) [XP] 1-15 * claims 1-42 *;
 [A]EP0738583  (KIRA CORP KK [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract *