EP1008191 - PRESTRESSED PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.09.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2005 | Refusal of application | published on 26.10.2005 [2005/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/24] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRANK, Wilhelm Meinhardtstrasse 44 D-96049 Bamberg / DE | 02 /
LEWENTZ, Günter Lärchenweg 5 D-93055 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
VOIGT, Andreas Liebigstrasse 27 D-93055 Regensburg / DE | [2000/24] | Application number, filing date | 98943711.6 | 22.07.1998 | [2000/24] | WO1998DE02061 | Priority number, date | DE1997133858 | 05.08.1997 Original published format: DE 19733858 | [2000/24] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9908330 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1008191 | Date: | 14.06.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/053, H01L41/083 | [2000/24] | CPC: |
F16F1/028 (EP,US);
H10N30/50 (EP,US);
H10N30/886 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US);
Y10T29/4987 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49872 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2000/24] | Title | German: | VORGESPANNTER PIEZOELEKTRISCHER AKTOR | [2000/24] | English: | PRESTRESSED PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATOR | [2000/24] | French: | ACTIONNEUR PIEZOELECTRIQUE PRECONTRAINT | [2000/24] | Entry into regional phase | 21.01.2000 | National basic fee paid | 21.01.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.01.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.01.2000 | Examination requested [2000/24] | 15.10.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2005/43] | 06.06.2005 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2005/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.07.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.07.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4460842 (WAANDERS JAN W [NL], et al) [X] 1* abstract * |