Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1002359

EP1002359 - RELUCTANCE MOTOR, ESPECIALLY A LINEAR RELUCTANCE MOTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  13.02.2009
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.03.2009  [2009/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEMIC Automotive Electric Motors GmbH
Sickingenstrasse 29-38
10553 Berlin / DE
[2005/37]
Former [2001/02]For all designated states
Continental ISAD Electronic Systems GmbH & Co. ohG
Justus-von-Liebig-Strasse 5
86899 Landsberg/Lech / DE
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
GRÜNDL UND HOFFMANN GmbH GESELLSCHAFT FÜR ELEKTROTECHNISCHE ENTWICKLUNGEN
Gautinger Strasse 6
82319 Starnberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / GRÜNDL, Andreas
Haseneystrasse 20
D-81377 München / DE
02 / HOFFMANN, Bernhard
Jakob-Tresch-Strasse 9
D-82319 Starnberg / DE
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Pröll, Jürgen , et al
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH
Patent und Lizenzen
Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2005/37]Pröll, Jürgen , et al
Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Patent und Lizenzen Sieboldstrasse 19
90411 Nürnberg / DE
Former [2000/21]Schmidt, Steffen J., Dipl.-Ing.
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff, Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Schweigerstrasse 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date98943836.104.08.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998EP04853
Priority number, dateDE199713372604.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19733726
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9908368
Date:18.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1002359
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02K19/10, H02K41/03
[2000/21]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/21]
TitleGerman:RELUKTANZMOTOR, INSBESONDERE LINEAR-RELUKTANZMOTOR[2000/21]
English:RELUCTANCE MOTOR, ESPECIALLY A LINEAR RELUCTANCE MOTOR[2000/21]
French:MOTEUR A RELUCTANCE, NOTAMMENT MOTEUR A RELUCTANCE LINEAIRE[2000/21]
Entry into regional phase23.12.1999National basic fee paid 
23.12.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
23.12.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.12.1999Examination requested  [2000/21]
24.10.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.05.2008Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.09.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/12]
29.10.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2009/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
24.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
16.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.07.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
18.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
14.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200811   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XA]DE4428321  (BENDRICH HORST [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-7,11 * column 1, line 33 - line 62; figure 1 * [A] 14;
 [A]FR2704993  (SIMU [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 7, line 4 - page 8, line 1; figures 1,7 *;
 [A]CH493140  (BARTHALON MAURICE [FR]) [A] 1-9,14 * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 34; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2029462  (SIEMENS AG) [A] 1-9 * page 8, paragraph 3 - page 9, paragraph 1; figure 6 *