EP1002104 - NOVEL METALLOPROTEASE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2003 [2003/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOOFT VAN HUIJSDUINEN, Robertus, Antonius, Marie Serono Pharma. Res Inst.14 chemin des Aulx 1228 Plan les Ouates / CH | [2000/21] | Representative(s) | Teuten, Andrew John, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/21] | Teuten, Andrew John, et al Glaxo Wellcome plc, Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98943839.5 | 05.08.1998 | [2000/21] | WO1998EP04859 | Priority number, date | GB19970016755 | 07.08.1997 Original published format: GB 9716755 | [2000/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9907856 | Date: | 18.02.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1002104 | Date: | 24.05.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.02.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/57, C12N9/64, A61K38/48, C12Q1/37, C07K16/40, A61K39/395, C12N5/10, A61K31/70, C12Q1/68 | [2000/21] | CPC: |
C12N9/6489 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P15/16 (EP);
A61P15/18 (EP);
A61K2039/51 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP);
A61K39/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/21] | Title | German: | METALLOPROTEASE | [2000/21] | English: | NOVEL METALLOPROTEASE | [2000/21] | French: | NOUVELLE METALLOPROTEASE | [2000/21] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.1999 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.1999 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.1999 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.1999 | Examination requested [2000/21] | 07.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.03.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/37] | 04.04.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2003/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9535118 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 6-10,13,14,18-20,26,27,31 * abstract *; | [PXY]WO9731109 (MOCHIDA PHARM CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1,2,4,5,16,17,22-25,30 * see SEQ ID NO 0005 and 0006 * [Y] 6-10,13,14,18-20,26,27,31; | [XY] - EMBL/GENBANK/DDBJ DATABASES Accession no AA400496, Sequence reference HS1200798 29 April 1997 HILLIER L ET AL:"WashU-Merck EST Project 1997", XP002088619 [X] 1-5,16,17,22-25 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10,13,14,18-20,26,27,30,31 | [XY] - WESKAMP G ET AL, "MDC9, A WIDELY EXPRESSED CELLULAR DISINTEGRIN CONTAINING CYTOPLASMIC SH3 LIGAND DOMAINS", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (199602), vol. 132, no. 4, pages 717 - 726, XP000644308 [X] 1,2,4,5,16-20,22-25,30 * the whole document * [Y] 6-10,13,14,18-20,26,27,31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.132.4.717 | [X] - EMBL/GENBANK/DDBJ DATABASES Accession no AA400588, Sequence reference HS1200890 29 April 1997 HILLIER L ET AL:"WashU-Merck EST Project 1997", XP002088620 [X] 22-24 * the whole document * | [Y] - WOLFSBERG T G ET AL, "ADAM, a widely distributed and developmentally regulated gene family encoding membrane proteins with a disintegrin and metalloprotease domain.", DEVELOPMENTAL BIOLOGY, (1995 MAY) 169 (1) 378-83. JOURNAL CODE: E7T. ISSN: 0012-1606., United States, XP002088617 [Y] 30 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/dbio.1995.1152 | [A] - WOLFSBERG T G ET AL, "ADAM, A NOVEL FAMILY OF MEMBRANE PROTEINS CONTAINING A DISINTEGRIN AND METALLOPROTEASE DOMAIN: MULTIPOTENTIAL FUNCTIONS IN CELL-CELL AND CELL-MATRIX INTERACTIONS", THE JOURNAL OF CELL BIOLOGY, (199510), vol. 131, no. 2, pages 275 - 278, XP002046453 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/jcb.131.2.275 | [PX] - HOOFT VAN HUIJSDUIJNEN R, "ADAM 20 and 21;two novel human testis -specific membrane metalloproteases with similarity to fertilin-alpha.", GENE, (1998 JAN 12) 206 (2) 273-82. JOURNAL CODE: FOP. ISSN: 0378-1119., Netherlands, XP002088618 [PX] 1-10,13,14,16-20,22-27,30,31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(97)00597-0 |