Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037648

EP1037648 - THE USE OF ERYTHROPOIETIN AND IRON PREPARATIONS FOR PRODUCING PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION PREPARATIONS FOR TREATING RHEUMATIC DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.02.2005
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip11.02.2005No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 30.03.2005  [2005/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
Sandhofer Strasse 116
68305 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Roche Diagnostics GmbH
68298 Mannheim / DE
Inventor(s)01 / LEHMANN, Paul
Johann-Sebastian-Bach-Strasse 14
D-67549 Worms / DE
02 / KALTWASSER, Joachim, Peter
In den Zeuläckern 30
D-60389 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Notegen, Eric-André , et al
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Notegen, Eric-André, Dr. , et al
Grenzacherstrasse 124
4070 Basel / CH
Application number, filing date98943842.905.08.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998EP04864
Priority number, dateDE199713429308.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19734293
[2000/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9907401
Date:18.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/07]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037648
Date:27.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037648
Date:07.04.2004
Language:DE
[2004/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP29.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K38/18, A61K33/26, A61P29/00, // (A61K38/18, 33:26)
[2003/45]
Former International [2000/39]A61K38/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:VERWENDUNG VON ERYTHROPOIETIN UND EISENPRÄPARATEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON PHARMAZEUTISCHEN KOMBINATIONSPRÄPARATEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON RHEUMATISCHEN ERKRANKUNGEN[2000/39]
English:THE USE OF ERYTHROPOIETIN AND IRON PREPARATIONS FOR PRODUCING PHARMACEUTICAL COMBINATION PREPARATIONS FOR TREATING RHEUMATIC DISEASES[2000/39]
French:UTILISATION DE PREPARATIONS D'ERYTHROPOIETINE ET DE FER POUR LA PRODUCTION DE PREPARATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES MIXTES DESTINEES AU TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES RHUMATISMALES[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase08.03.2000National basic fee paid 
08.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
08.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.12.1998Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
08.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
06.02.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.05.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.10.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.02.2004Fee for grant paid
04.02.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.01.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
14.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
13.08.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[XY]GB2171304  (CHUGAI PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD) [X] 10-12 *siehe insbesondere Seite 2, Zeilen 19-26, und Beispiel 6* [Y] 1-9;
 [DY]WO9614081  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [DY] 1-9 *siehe insbesondere Ansprüche, und Tabellen IV-V *;
 [Y]EP0025721  (HOLLAND CHARLES COTTRELL) [Y] 1-9 * siehe insbesondere Anspruch 1 und Beispiel 2 *;
 [XD]WO9709996  (BOEHRINGER MANNHEIM GMBH [DE], et al) [XD] 10-12 *siehe insbesondere Ansprüche 1-7,13-15*;
 [XY]  - NORDSTROM D ET AL, "Availability of iron and degree of inflammation modifies the response to recombinant human erythropoietin when treating anemia of chronic disease in patients with rheumatoid arthritis.", RHEUMATOLOGY INTERNATIONAL, (1997) 17 (2) 67-73. JOURNAL CODE: TDZ. ISSN: 0172-8172., GERMANY: Germany, Federal Republic of, XP002093019 [X] 10-12 * siehe inbesondere Zusammenfassung; letzter Abschnitt der Einleitung; Tabelle * [Y] 1-9

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s002960050011
 [Y]  - HOCHLI P ET AL, "Repeated continuous administration of low doses of intravenous iron in anemic patients with active rheumatoid arthritis [letter].", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, (1993 JUL) 51 (1) 54-5. JOURNAL CODE: ERF. ISSN: 0902-4441., Denmark, XP002093020 [Y] 1-9 * siehe das ganze Dokument *