Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1001874 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9804913 | 06.08.1998 | US6242397 | 15.10.1997 | DE19734056 | 06.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2299255 | 18.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9804913 | 06.08.1998 | US6242397 | 15.10.1997 | DE19734056 | 06.08.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6634405 | 21.10.2003 | B2 | US2001030012 | 18.10.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US88382601 | 18.06.2001 | US49850300 | 04.02.2000 | EP9804913 | 06.08.1998 | DE19734056 | 06.08.1997 | US6242397 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6425968 | 30.07.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US49850300 | 04.02.2000 | EP9804913 | 06.08.1998 | DE19734056 | 06.08.1997 | US6242397 | 15.10.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9907542 | Global Dossier | 18.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6242397 | 15.10.1997 | DE19734056 | 06.08.1997 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19835660 | 04.03.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US6242397 | 15.10.1997 | DE19734056 | 06.08.1997 |