Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1001874

EP1001874 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STICKING TWO HALVES OF A DVD (DIGITAL VERSATILE DISC) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.08.2008
Database last updated on 14.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KraussMaffei Technologies GmbH
Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
[2008/07]
Former [2008/01]For all designated states
KrausMaffei Technologies GmbH
Krauss-Maffei Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
Former [2007/42]For all designated states
Krauss Maffei GmbH
Krauss-Maffei Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
Former [2000/21]For all designated states
Krauss-Maffei Kunststofftechnik GmbH
Krauss-Maffei Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
Inventor(s)01 / EICHLSEDER, Martin
Ottenberg 1
D-94167 Tettenweis / DE
[2000/21]
Representative(s)Zollner, Richard , et al
KraussMaffei Group GmbH
Patentabteilung TS
Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/30]Zollner, Richard , et al
KrausMaffei AG Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
Former [2004/37]Zollner, Richard, Dipl.-Phys. , et al
Patentanwalt mannesmann plastics machinery GmbH FS Krauss-Maffei Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
Former [2002/26]Zollner, Richard , et al
Mannesmann Plastics Machinery AG Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
Former [2001/12]Rucker, Bernd
Krauss-Maffei Kunststofftechnik GmbH ZR 3 Patentabteilung Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2
D-80997 München / DE
Former [2000/21]Wilhelm, Ludwig
Mannesmann Demag Krauss-Maffei AG ZR 3 - Patentabteilung Krauss-Maffei-Strasse 2
80997 München / DE
Application number, filing date98943858.506.08.1998
[2000/21]
WO1998EP04913
Priority number, dateDE199713405606.08.1997         Original published format: DE 19734056
US1997006242315.10.1997         Original published format: US 62423
[2000/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9907542
Date:18.02.1999
Language:DE
[1999/07]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1001874
Date:24.05.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.02.1999
[2000/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.02.1999
ClassificationInternational:B29C65/52, G11B7/26, B32B37/12
[2007/52]
Former International [2000/21]B29C65/52, G11B7/26, B32B31/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/21]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM VERKLEBEN VON ZWEI DVD (DIGITAL VERSATILE DISC)-HALBSEITEN[2000/21]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR STICKING TWO HALVES OF A DVD (DIGITAL VERSATILE DISC)[2000/21]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE COLLER DEUX MOITIES D'UN DVD[2000/21]
Entry into regional phase06.03.2000National basic fee paid 
06.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
06.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
03.03.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/21]
06.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.11.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.06.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.11.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.08.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.12.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.11.2007Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.04.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2008/40]
14.05.2008Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2008/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.08.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.08.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
31.08.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.08.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.08.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.08.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]JPS63124247  ;
 [PX]WO9736737  (TOOLEX ALPHA AB [SE], et al) [PX] 1-5,9,11-15,17,21 * page 1 - page 3 * * page 7, line 26 - page 8 * * figures 6,7 *;
 [PA]WO9743760  (TOOLEX ALPHA AB [SE], et al) [PA] 13 * figure -; claim 1 *;
 [PA]WO9735720  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP], et al) [PA] 1-26 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0773372  (KITANO ENG CO LTD [JP]) [A] 17,21,22 * column 5, line 32 - column 9, line 57; figure 1 *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19881012), vol. 012, no. 380, Database accession no. (P - 769), [X] 1-3,14-16,21,26 * abstract *