Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1015280

EP1015280 - INTERIOR EQUIPMENT ELEMENT FOR VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR MOTOR VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.11.2003
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.01.2004  [2004/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Visteon Systemes Interieurs
Tour Europlaza, 20 Avenue André Prothin, La Defense 4
92927 La Defense Cedex / FR
[2000/27]
Inventor(s)01 / BEY, Christian
37, rue Jean-Baptiste Marquant
F-59147 Gondecourt / FR
02 / PIEPER, Horst
37, rue Jean-Baptiste Marquant
F-59147 Gondecourt / FR
[2000/27]
Representative(s)Duthoit, Michel Georges André
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés
96/98, Boulevard Carnot
B.P. 105
59027 Lille Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2000/27]Duthoit, Michel
Bureau Duthoit Legros Associés 19, Square Dutilleul BP 105
59027 Lille Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98944007.816.09.1998
[2000/27]
WO1998FR01988
Priority number, dateFR1997001190119.09.1997         Original published format: FR 9711901
[2000/27]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9915369
Date:01.04.1999
Language:FR
[1999/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1015280
Date:05.07.2000
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1015280
Date:15.01.2003
Language:FR
[2003/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/20
[2000/27]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR [2000/27]
TitleGerman:FAHRZEUGINNENAUSSTATTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG[2000/27]
English:INTERIOR EQUIPMENT ELEMENT FOR VEHICLE, IN PARTICULAR MOTOR VEHICLE[2000/27]
French:ELEMENT D'EQUIPEMENT INTERIEUR POUR VEHICULE, NOTAMMENT VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2000/27]
Entry into regional phase07.03.2000National basic fee paid 
07.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/27]
03.07.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.02.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2002Fee for grant paid
06.11.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)16.10.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.03.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
22.08.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0358230  (TIP ENG GROUP INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9,10 * column 6, line 51 - column 7, line 36; figure 4 *;
 [X]EP0428935  (TIP ENG GROUP INC [US]) [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * column 6, line 4 - line 58; figure 2 *;
 [X]WO9630232  (DAVIDSON TEXTRON INC [US]) [X] 1-3,6,7,9,10 * page 12, line 17 - line 32; figure 2 *;
 [X]US5375876  (BAUER DAVID J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6-8,10 * column 4, line 10 - line 62; figure 2 *;
 [X]US5445410  (CZAPP ADELBERT T [US], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9 * column 2, line 57 - column 3, line 17; figure 3 *;
 [X]DE4419738  (YMOS AG IND PRODUKTE [DE]) [X] 1-3,7,9,10 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 48; figures 3,4 *;
 [X]US5429385  (KAMIJI KOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,7,9,10 * column 3, line 40 - line 59; figures 2,3,5,6 *
ExaminationWO9901317