blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0994787

EP0994787 - BRAKE CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.04.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 19.05.2004  [2004/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PML Flightlink Ltd
Riverwey Industrial Park, Newman Lane
Alton GU34 2QW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2002/51]For all designated states
PML Flightlink Ltd
Riverwey Industrial Park, Newman Lane
Alton GU34 2QW / GB
Former [2000/17]For all designated states
Elliott Industries Limited
Elliott House Victoria Road
London NW10 6NY / GB
Inventor(s)01 / PUGH, Gavin, Scott
36 Kings Road
Petersfield Hampshire GU32 3QY / GB
[2000/17]
Representative(s)McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/17]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell, et al
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date98944032.610.07.1998
[2000/17]
WO1998GB02039
Priority number, dateGB1997001471011.07.1997         Original published format: GB 9714710
[2000/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9902363
Date:21.01.1999
Language:EN
[1999/03]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0994787
Date:26.04.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.01.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP21.01.1999
ClassificationIPC:B60L15/20, B60L7/24
[2000/17]
CPC:
B60L15/2018 (EP,US); B60L15/2009 (EP,US); B60L7/24 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US); Y02T10/72 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   NL,   SE [2000/17]
TitleGerman:BREMSREGELVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN[2000/17]
English:BRAKE CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD[2000/17]
French:PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE COMMANDE DE FREIN[2000/17]
Entry into regional phase11.02.2000National basic fee paid 
11.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.02.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/17]
21.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.05.2003Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.11.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/21]
19.12.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2004/21]
Request for further processing for:02.05.2001Request for further processing filed
02.05.2001Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request deemed not to be filed
18.05.2001Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.05.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
18.05.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.07.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.200205   M06   Fee paid on   09.09.2002
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[A]GB2285143  (SAMSUNG HEAVY IND [KR]) [A] 1,2,30-32 * abstract *;
 [A]DE19517567  (FUJI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [A] 1,2,23,30-32 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH01284245  ;
 [A]WO9304888  (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 30 * abstract *;
 [A]JPH0373145
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900202), vol. 014, no. 057, Database accession no. (C - 0684), & JP01284245 A 19891115 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [A] 1,24,26,30-32 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910619), vol. 015, no. 238, Database accession no. (C - 0841), & JP03073145 A 19910328 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD) [A] 1,30-32 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.