Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1012414

EP1012414 - MANHOLE SHUTTERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.05.2004
Database last updated on 17.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.05.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 14.07.2004  [2004/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wilson, Stephen
32 Priors Walk, Kirkhill Morpeth
Northumberland NE61 2RF / GB
For all designated states
Thompson, Alastair Nigel
Westerley, Farnham Lane Ferrensby
Knaresborough HG5 9JG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]For all designated states
Wilson, Stephen
32 Priors Walk, Kirkhill
Morpeth, Northumberland NE61 2RF / GB
For all designated states
Thompson, Alastair Nigel
Westerley, Farnham Lane
Ferrensby, Knaresborough HG5 9JG / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/26]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/26]Harrison Goddard Foote
Belmont House, 20 Wood Lane
Leeds LS6 2AE / GB
Application number, filing date98944034.214.09.1998
[2000/26]
WO1998GB02719
Priority number, dateGB1997001942313.09.1997         Original published format: GB 9719423
[2000/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9914444
Date:25.03.1999
Language:EN
[1999/12]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1012414
Date:28.06.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.1999
[2000/26]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1012414
Date:23.07.2003
Language:EN
[2003/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.03.1999
ClassificationInternational:E03F5/02
[2000/26]
Designated contracting statesGB,   IE [2000/26]
TitleGerman:SCHALUNG FÜR DAS INNERE EINES SCHACHTES[2000/26]
English:MANHOLE SHUTTERS[2000/26]
French:PANNEAUX DE COFFRAGE POUR REGARDS DE VISITE[2000/26]
Entry into regional phase20.03.2000National basic fee paid 
20.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
20.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
20.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/26]
26.07.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.12.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.04.2003Fee for grant paid
25.04.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.04.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
19.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[DA]GB2300663  (WILSON STEPHEN [GB], et al) [DA] 1,5 * page 2, paragraph 7 - paragraph 12; figure - *;
 [A]US4867411  (DORSEY WAYNE W [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * column A; figure - *
by applicantGB2300663