Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1017699

EP1017699 - PROCESS FOR RECOVERY OF A BETA-LACTAM ANTIBIOTIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/28]PROCESS FOR RECOVERY OF A $g(b)-LACTAM ANTIBIOTIC
[2003/25]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  22.08.2003
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.10.2003  [2003/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]For all designated states
DSM N.V.
Het Overloon 1
6411 TE Heerlen / NL
Inventor(s)01 / BOESTEN, Wilhelmus, Hubertus, Joseph
Brountslaan 9
NL-6132 BJ Sittard / NL
02 / MOODY, Harold, Monro
Hoogzwanenstraat 148
NL-6211 BZ Maastricht / NL
03 / GROOTEN, Hubertus, Maria, Jozef
Heuvelstraat 7
NL-6181 PE Stein / NL
[2000/28]
Representative(s)Jacobs, Monique S.N. , et al
DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9
6160 MA Geleen / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/28]Jacobs, Monique S.N. , et al
DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen Postbus 9
6160 MA Geleen / NL
Application number, filing date98944338.718.09.1998
[2000/28]
WO1998NL00539
Priority number, dateNL1997100707619.09.1997         Original published format: NL 1007076
[2000/28]
Filing languageNL
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9915532
Date:01.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/13]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1017699
Date:12.07.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.1999
[2000/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07D499/18, C07D501/12, C12P37/04, C12P35/04
[2000/28]
Designated contracting statesAT,   ES,   IT,   NL [2000/28]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG VON EINEM BETA-LAKTAM ANTIBIOTIKUM[2000/28]
English:PROCESS FOR RECOVERY OF A BETA-LACTAM ANTIBIOTIC[2003/25]
French:METHODE DE RECUPERATION DE BETA-LACTAMINE[2000/28]
Former [2000/28]PROCESS FOR RECOVERY OF A $g(b)-LACTAM ANTIBIOTIC
Entry into regional phase18.09.1998Translation filed 
07.03.2000National basic fee paid 
07.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/28]
01.04.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/41]
06.05.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
24.09.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9722610  (CHEMFERM VOF [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 7 - page 4, line 19; claim - *;
 [A]WO9630376  (CHEMFERM VOF [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9623796  (CHEMFERM VOF [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9503420  (DSM NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5034522  (SCHREIBER FRED G [US]) [A] 1-15 * claim - *;
 [PA]NL1002818C  (CHEMFERM VOF [NL]) [PA] 1-15 * claim - *